EP1702336 - SEPARATE WRITE AND READ ACCESS ARCHITECTURE FOR MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATTI, Romney, R. 19490 Muirfield Circle Shorewood, MN 55331 / US | [2006/47] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
KATTI, Romney, R. 8636 Terraceview Lane N. Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05757745.4 | 10.01.2005 | [2006/38] | WO2005US00819 | Priority number, date | US20040754880 | 10.01.2004 Original published format: US 754880 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005096313 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702336 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G11C11/15 (EP,US);
H10B61/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRENNTE SCHREIB- UND LESEZUGRIFFSARCHITEKTUR FÜR EINEN MAGNETTUNNELÜBERGANG | [2006/38] | English: | SEPARATE WRITE AND READ ACCESS ARCHITECTURE FOR MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION | [2006/38] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'ACCES EN LECTURE/ECRITURE DISTINCT POUR JONCTION A EFFET TUNNEL MAGNETIQUE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2009 | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/17] | 10.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6391483 (ZHU JIAN-GANG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,23,33 * * column 11, lines 28-55 * * column 12, lines 6-17 * [A] 4,5; | [XA]WO02084706 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * abstract * * pages 2-7 * [A] 3,6,7; | [X]US6498747 (GOGL DIETMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9* the whole document *; | [X] - SCHEUERLEIN R E, "Magneto-resistive IC memory limitations and architecture implications", NONVOLATILE MEMORY TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1998. 1998 PROCEEDINGS. SEVENTH BIENNIAL IEEE ALBUQUERQUE, NM, USA 22-24 JUNE 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980622), ISBN 0-7803-4518-5, pages 47 - 50, XP010309468 [X] 1,4,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NVMT.1998.723217 |