EP1765451 - DEVICES FOR ARTERIO-VENOUS FISTULA CREATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/13] | DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR ARTERIO-VENOUS FISTULA CREATION | ||
[2021/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2021/46] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Rox Medical Inc. 150 Calle Iglesia, Suite A San Clemente CA 92672 / US | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Rox Medical Inc. 5825 Avenida Encinas, Suite 103 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENNEMAN, Rodney 34002 Las Palmas Del Mar San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | 02 /
CALI, Douglas, S. 25702 Morales Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 03 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 242 Ipswich Road Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05757868.4 | 08.06.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US20360 | Priority number, date | US20040579913P | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 579913 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005122919 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1765451 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765451 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11, A61B17/00 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00252 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00592 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00597 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0061 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00889 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | A61M31/00, A61B17/11 | ||
Former IPC [2007/13] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIE ERZEUGUNG EINER ARTERIOVENÖSEN FISTEL | [2021/19] | English: | DEVICES FOR ARTERIO-VENOUS FISTULA CREATION | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DESTINES A LA CREATION D'UNE FISTULE ARTERIELLE ET VEINEUSE | [2021/21] |
Former [2007/13] | VORRICHTUNGEN; SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ERZEUGUNG EINER ARTERIOVENÖSEN FISTEL | ||
Former [2007/13] | DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR ARTERIO-VENOUS FISTULA CREATION | ||
Former [2007/13] | PROCEDES, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTEMES DESTINES A LA CREATION D'UNE FISTULE ARTERIELLE ET VEINEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2005 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | GB | 08.06.2022 | IE | 08.06.2022 | LU | 08.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.06.2005 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.06.2005 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 08.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9727898 (TRANSVASCULAR INC [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,14 * abstract * * page 19, line 12 - page 22, line 15 * * page 41, line 23 - page 44, line 18 *; | [A]US5690670 (DAVIDSON JAMES A [US]) [A] 11* column 7, lines 56-60 *; | [X]US6152937 (PETERSON ALEX ALDEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,15,17-19 * abstract * * column 7, line 62 - column 9, line 51 *; | [XY]US6190353 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-11,17,19,22-33 * abstract * * column 14, lines 50-59 * * column 26, lines 9-20 * * column 30, lines 5-52 * * column 45, line 8 - column 46, line 7 * [Y] 5,6,14; | [Y]US6241743 (LEVIN HOWARD R [US], et al) [Y] 20,21 * abstract * * column 5, lines 21-62 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 42 *; | [A]US2003014061 (HOUSER RUSSELL A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7,11,12,14,18,21-23,29 * abstract *; | [A]US6579311 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US]) [A] 1-7,10,11,15,18,19,22-33 * abstract *; | [A]US2003120292 (PARK ADRIAN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7-10,13,15,17-19,27,28,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0044] *; | [XY]US2003225425 (KUPIECKI DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-13,16,17,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] - [0068] - [0070] - [0077] * [Y] 20,21 | International search | [A]US5682906 (STERMAN WESLEY D [US], et al); | [A]US5718725 (STERMAN WESLEY D [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003225425 | US6190353 | US6152937 |