EP1780483 - COOLING BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAYA, Mizuho Room 443, Sobiryo, 3-2-8, Atobekitano-cho Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0068 / JP | 02 /
CHEN, Wei Room 612, Puresute 7-bankan, 4, Zaimokumachi Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1141 / JP | 03 /
TATSUMI, Hiroshi 5-16, Jurokusen, Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-0304 / JP | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Brown, Kenneth Richard R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05758333.8 | 07.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005JP12556 | Priority number, date | JP20040221611 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004221611 | [2007/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011344 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780483 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F25B49/02 (KR);
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
F25D11/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25D29/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25D21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/45] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASTENFÖRMIGE KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2007/18] | English: | COOLING BOX | [2007/18] | French: | BOITE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2007 | Translation filed | 23.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 03.01.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2004101050 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2000018746 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2003314937 (SHARP KK) |