EP1776305 - TRAVERSING DEVICE AT A SPINNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Patente und Lizenzen Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜST, Olivier Gladiolenstrasse 29 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | 02 /
JEHLE, Volker Oberdorfstrasse 7 D-78337 Öhningen / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
WÜST, Olivier Gladiolenstrasse 29 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | ||
02 /
JEHLE, Volker Adetswilerstrasse 6 CH-8344 Bäretswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 05758469.0 | 15.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005CH00408 | Priority number, date | EP20040018903 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04018903 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006015502 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776305 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/28, B65H54/38 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B65H54/2839 (EP);
B65H54/38 (EP);
B65H54/381 (EP);
B65H54/42 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, CZ, DE, IT, LI, TR [2007/36] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHANGIERVORRICHTUNG AN SPINNMASCHINE | [2007/17] | English: | TRAVERSING DEVICE AT A SPINNING MACHINE | [2007/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VA-ET-VIENT CHEZ UN MÉTIER À FILER | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 13.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1795 (JOHN ALEXANDER SCHOFIELD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, line 14 - line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE1785075 (RUF,JOSEF) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2319128 (INDUSTRIE-WERKE KARLSRUHE AUGSBURG AG, 7500 KARLSRUHE) [A] 1,5-10 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 6 - page 15, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * figure 3 *; | [A]DE1913451 (MASCHINENFABRIK SCHWEITER AG) [A] 1,6,8,10,11 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3; figures 3,4 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE3920374 (W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO, 4050 MOENCHENGLADBACH, DE) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 21 - line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3738701 (BARMAG AG; BARMAG AG, 5630 REMSCHEID, DE) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3332382 (MASCHINENFABRIK SCHWEITER AG; MASCHINENFABRIK SCHWEITER AG, HORGEN, CH) [A] 1 * figure 4 * |