EP1766302 - APPARATUS FOR HEAT EXCHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/13] | HEAT EXCHANGER FOR USE IN COOLING LIQUIDS | ||
[2019/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icegen Patent Corp. 10 Wanless Avenue, Suite 201 Toronto, ON M5H 2M5 / CA | [2020/47] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states 1807983 Ontario Limited 70 Hanlan Road, Unit 3 Woodbridge ON / CA | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Mogilevsky, Mikhail 54 Michael Ct. Thornhill ON L4J 3A9 / CA | ||
For all designated states Gerber, Lionel 70 Theodore Place Thornhill ON L4J 8E4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOGILEVSKY, Mikhail 54 Michael Ct. Thornhill, Ontario L4J 3A9 / CA | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/26] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/13] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05759155.4 | 23.06.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005CA00986 | Priority number, date | CA20042471969 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: CA 2471969 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000090 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766302 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766302 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/14, F28F3/14 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
F25B39/022 (EP,NO,US);
F25C1/14 (EP,KR,NO,US);
F25C1/142 (NO,US);
F28F13/06 (US);
F28F19/008 (EP,US);
F28F3/00 (US);
F28F3/005 (US);
F28F3/025 (EP,US);
F28F3/14 (KR);
F28F2215/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM WÄRMETAUSCH | [2019/40] | English: | APPARATUS FOR HEAT EXCHANGE | [2019/40] | French: | APPAREIL POUR L'ÈCHANGE THERMIQUE | [2019/40] |
Former [2007/13] | WÄRMETAUSCHER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KÜHLFLÜSSIGKEITEN | ||
Former [2007/13] | HEAT EXCHANGER FOR USE IN COOLING LIQUIDS | ||
Former [2007/13] | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT DES LIQUIDES | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2005 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4130996 (SULT GRATZ M) [X] 1-12,21 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP0670461 (G R B S N C DI GROTTI RENZO & [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH07280484 (CALSONIC CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5560425 (SUGAWARA MASATSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001047862 (ANDERSON ALEXANDER F [US], et al) [X] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]US3863462 (TREUER ALLAN J); | [A]US4669277 (GOLDSTEIN VLADIMIR L [CA]); | [X]CA1331287 (VIKOOL PTY LTD [AU]) | Examination | JPH04108173U | DE10146368 | by applicant | JPH04108173U | US5157939 | US5363659 | US5632159 | US5918477 |