EP1765801 - SEPARATION OF PROPYLENE OXIDE FROM A MIXTURE COMPRISING PROPYLENE OXIDE AND METHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | |||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖBBEL, Hans-Georg Im Mosenborn 33 67169 Kallstadt / DE | 02 /
SCHULTZ, Henning Kleinfeldstrasse 43 68165 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
SCHULTZ, Peter Auf der Gänsweide 3 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 04 /
PATRASCU, Renate Distelweg 11b 21682 Stade / DE | 05 /
SCHULZ, Malte Bi de School 4 21723 Hollern-Tw. / DE | 06 /
WEIDENBACH, Meinolf Schwagerstrasse 5A 21706 Drochtersen / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05760069.4 | 06.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005EP07300 | Priority number, date | US20040884968 | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 884968 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006003004 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1765801 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765801 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/32 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
C07D301/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABTRENNUNG VON PROPYLENOXID AUS EINER PROPYLENOXID UND METHANOL ENTHALTENDEN MISCHUNG | [2007/13] | English: | SEPARATION OF PROPYLENE OXIDE FROM A MIXTURE COMPRISING PROPYLENE OXIDE AND METHANOL | [2007/13] | French: | SEPARATION D'OXYDE DE PROPYLENE D'UN MELANGE COMPORTANT DE L'OXYDE DE PROPYLENE ET DU METHANOL | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | LT | 12.11.2008 | LV | 12.11.2008 | PL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | IS | 12.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | IE | 06.07.2009 | LU | 06.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.07.2009 | ||
LU | 06.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
IE | 06.07.2009 | ||
LU | 06.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
IE | 06.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
IE | 06.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 12.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]DD118873 ((HAACK H. ET AL.) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4140588 (SCHMIDT JOHN P) [A] * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 22 *; | [X]EP0811617 (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 26 * * page 4, line 52 *; | [XD]US5849938 (RUETER MICHAEL A [US], et al) [XD] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 55; examples 1,2 *; | [AD]US6500311 (SAWYER GARY A [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1424332 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] * |