EP1776317 - INK JET RECORDING PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Specialty Minerals (Michigan) Inc. 30 600 Telegraph Road Bingham Farms, Michigan 48025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Specialty Minerals Michigan Inc. 30 600 Telegraph Road Bingham Farms, Michigan 48025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUPERKA, Annmarie 6688 Iroquois Trail Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 02 /
ROTH, Kevin, Jay 5249 Cheryl Drive Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates, 4 The Gatehouse, 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05760202.1 | 08.06.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005US20201 | Priority number, date | US20040867535 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 867535 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123593 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776317 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/18, B41M5/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
C01F11/18 (KR);
B41M5/00 (KR);
C01F11/182 (EP,US);
C01F11/183 (EP,US);
C01F11/185 (EP,US);
C09C1/02 (KR);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
B41M2205/12 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSPAPIER | [2007/17] | English: | INK JET RECORDING PAPER | [2007/17] | French: | PAPIER D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR IMPESSION À JET D'ENCRE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5007964 (TSUKISAKA RYOGO [JP], et al) [X] 11-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 10, line 48 * * example 3 * [A] 1-10,14-16; | [A]EP0445952 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - column 7, line 41 *; | [A]EP0850685 (ECC INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5783038 (DONIGIAN DOUGLAS WARD [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 12 * [A] 1-13,15,16; | [A]WO9951691 (ECC INT INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 22, line 13 * * examples 1-3 *; | [XA]EP1081197 (MINERALS TECH INC [US]) [X] 14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029] * [A] 1-13,15,16; | [A]EP1160201 (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XA]US2003124272 (WATSON MARK VICTOR [GB], et al) [X] 14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] * * claims 1-17 * [A] 1-13,15,16; | [A]WO2004026973 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 14* the whole document * |