EP1751543 - MULTI-SENSOR SYSTEM FOR FLUID MONITORING WITH SELECTIVE EXPOSURE OF SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Analytical Instruments, Inc. 6060 Spine Road Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states GE Intellectual Property Licensing, Inc. 105 Carnegie Center, 3rd Floor Princeton NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Sensicore, Inc. 745 Phoenix Drive Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHN, Malcolm, R. 301 Wichita Trail Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | 02 /
MAN, Piu, Francis 114 Monet Circle Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Glenn 26206 Kiltarton Farmington Hills, MI 48334 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
KAHN, Malcolm, R. 301 Wichita Trail Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | ||
02 /
MAN, Piu, Francis 2813 Barclay Way Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
03 /
MARTIN, Glenn 26206 Kiltarton Farmington Hills, MI 48334 / US | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/30] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE - London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05761075.0 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US15999 | Priority number, date | US20040840650 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 840650 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005111602 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1751543 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/0031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTISENSORSYSTEM ZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSÜBERWACHUNG MIT SELEKTIVER SENSOREXPOSITION | [2007/07] | English: | MULTI-SENSOR SYSTEM FOR FLUID MONITORING WITH SELECTIVE EXPOSURE OF SENSORS | [2007/07] | French: | SYSTÈME MULTICAPTEUR POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE FLUIDES AVEC EXPOSITION SÉLECTIVE DES CAPTEURS | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2008 | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5525297 (DINGER RUDOLF [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,6,52,55,57 * abstract * * column 1, lines 27-47 *; | [A]US6123820 (BERGKUIST CAROLYN [US], et al) [A] 3,54 * abstract ** column 7, lines 25-54 *; | [XY]US6290908 (FUKUNAGA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,52-57 * abstract * * column 6, lines 33-43 * * column 9, line 46 - column 11, line 5 * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]EP1197753 (RIKEN KEIKI KK [JP]) [Y] 7-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0017]; figures 4-7 * |