EP1758780 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A NEGATIVE PRESSURE IN A VACUUM CHAMBER OF A PNEUMATIC BRAKE BOOSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHONLAU, Jürgen Mühlstrasse 62b 65396 Walluf / DE | 02 /
RÜFFER, Manfred Grüner Weg 3 65843 Sulzbach / DE | 03 /
GONZALEZ, Jose Nelkenweg 2a 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 05761129.5 | 17.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005EP52831 | Priority number, date | DE20041029115 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004029115 | DE20051027768 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005027768 | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123476 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758780 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758780 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/02, B60T13/52 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B60T13/52 (EP,KR,US);
B60T17/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/39] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON UNTERDRUCK IN EINER UNTERDRUCKKAMMER EINES PNEUMATISCHEN BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKERS | [2007/10] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A NEGATIVE PRESSURE IN A VACUUM CHAMBER OF A PNEUMATIC BRAKE BOOSTER | [2007/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE CREATION D'UNE DEPRESSION DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE DEPRESSION D'UN SERVOFREIN PNEUMATIQUE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 07.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19929880 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4416833 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0999109 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4738112 (NOMURA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6324845 (FULKS GARY CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * |