EP1740655 - METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF MODULAR POLY(PHENYLENEETHYNYLENES) AND FINE TUNING THE ELECTRONIC PROPERTIES THEREOF FOR THE FUNCTIONALIZATION OF NANOMATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zyvex Performance Materials, LLC 1255 Kinnear Road, Suite 100 Columbus OH 43212-1155 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Zyvex Performance Materials, LLC 1255 Kinnear Road Suite 100 Columbus OH 43212-1155 / US | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Zyvex Corporation 1321 North Plano Road Richardson, TX 75081 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIT-HADDOU, Hassan 1111 Crestridge Drive Plano, Texas 75075 / US | 02 /
RUTKOFSKY, Marni 2204 West Park Blvd., 2801 Plano, Texas 75075 / US | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05762083.3 | 13.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005US12717 | Priority number, date | US20040561562P | 13.04.2004 Original published format: US 561562 P | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100466 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740655 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/06, C08K3/04, C08K3/38, C08K3/28, C08G61/02, H01B1/12 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H01B1/125 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/174 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08G61/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/10 (KR);
C08K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2202/02 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2202/06 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/03] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE MODULARER POLY(PHENYLENETHYNYLENE) UND FEINABSTIMMUNG DER ELEKTRONISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN ZUR FUNKTIONALISIERUNG VON NANOMATERIALIEN | [2007/02] | English: | METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF MODULAR POLY(PHENYLENEETHYNYLENES) AND FINE TUNING THE ELECTRONIC PROPERTIES THEREOF FOR THE FUNCTIONALIZATION OF NANOMATERIALS | [2007/02] | French: | PROCEDES DE SYNTHESE DE POLY(PHENYLENE-ETHYNYLENES) MODULAIRES ET DE REGLAGE FIN DES PROPRIETES ELECTRONIQUES DE CEUX-CI POUR LA FONCTIONNALISATION DE NANOMATERIAUX | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003178607 (SWAGER TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17-19,26-42 * paragraphs [0107] , [0108]; figures 21a,24; claims 67,70,71 *; | [X]EP1359169 (ZYVEX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,17-19,26-29* claim - *; | [DX] - ZHOU ET AL, Fluorescent Chemosensors Based on Energy Migration in Conjugated Polymers: The Molecular Wire Approach to Increase Sensitivity, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, PAGE(S) 12593-12602, (1995), ISSN 0002-7863, XP002111382 [DX] 1-5,19-36 * page 12595, column 1 * * page 12601 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00155a023 | [X] - KATSUYA KOISHI, TSUYOSHI IKEDA, KOICHI KONDO, TORU SAKAGUCHI, KENJI KAMADA, KEIKO TAWA, KOJI OHTA, "Synthesis and nonlinear properties of 1,3- and 1,4-disubstituted type of poly(phenyleneethynylene)s containing electron-donor and acceptor group", MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2000), vol. 201, no. 5, pages 525 - 532, XP002344450 [X] 1-4,7,8,19-29,33 * page 528 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3935(20000301)201:5<525::AID-MACP525>3.0.CO;2-A | [DX] - BUNZ U H F, "POLY(ARYLENEETHYNYLENE)S: SYNTHESES, PROPERTIES, STRUCTURE, AND APPLICATIONS", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (2000), vol. 100, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 1605 - 1644, XP001153768 [DX] 1-4,7,8,19-29,33 * table 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr990257j | [X] - TAKAKAZU YAMAMOTO, TOHRU KIMURA, KOUICHI SHIRAISHI, "Preparation of Pi-Conjugated Polymers Composed of Hydroquinone, p-Benzoquinone, and p-Diacetoxyphenylene Units. Optical and Redox Properties of the Polymers", MACROMOLECULES, (1999), vol. 32, pages 8886 - 8896, XP002344451 [X] 1-6,19-29 * page 8887, column 1 * * page 8890, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma9907946 | [X] - MORONI M ET AL, RIGID ROD CONJUGATED POLYMERS FOR NONLINEAR OPTICS. 1. CHARACTERIZATION AND LINEAR OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF POLY(ARYLENEETHYNYLENE) DERIVATIVES, MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, PAGE(S) 562-571, (1994), ISSN 0024-9297, XP000650214 [X] 1-8,19-29 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00080a034 | [DX] - JIAN CHEN, HAIYING LIU, WAYNE A. WEIMER, MATHEW D. HALLS, DAVID H. WALDECK, GILBERT C. WALKER, "Noncovalent Engineering of Carbon Nanotube Surfaces by Rigid, Functional Conjugated Polymers", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2002), vol. 124, page 9034-9035, XP002344452 [DX] 1,2,4,17-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja026104m |