EP1776631 - Computer terminal and method for presenting status information of simultaneous tasks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/17] | IMPROVED MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL AND METHOD | ||
[2010/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄKELÄ, Mikko, K. Insinöörinkatu 47 A 23 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Nordic Patent Service Pilestræde 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2007/41] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus G. G., et al Nordic Patent Service ApS Pilestraede 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2007/17] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus G. G. Walstijn Intellectual Property ApS Pilestraede 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 05762538.6 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP07920 | Priority number, date | US20040912968 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: US 912968 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006013007 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776631 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776631 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
H04L43/10 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rechnerendgerät und Verfahren für Darstellung von Statusinformationen von gleichzeitig auszuführenden Aufgaben | [2010/46] | English: | Computer terminal and method for presenting status information of simultaneous tasks | [2010/46] | French: | Terminal d'ordinateur et procédé pour présentation de données d'état de tâches simultanées | [2010/46] |
Former [2007/17] | VERBESSERTES MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2007/17] | IMPROVED MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL AND METHOD | ||
Former [2007/17] | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES AMELIORE ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | HU | 13.07.2011 | IT | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | LV | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | LU | 20.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LU | 20.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LU | 20.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 13.07.2011 | |
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 13.07.2011 | |
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 13.07.2011 | |
IS | 13.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004191517 ; | [A]US5892511 (GELSINGER PATRICK P [US], et al) [A] 2,11,43 * column 7, line 8 - line 38; figure 3 *; | [I]CA2267549 (OBJECT TECHNOLOGY INTERNAT INC [CA]) [I] 17,31-34 * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 11; figure 3 *; | [A]US2002083025 (ROBARTS JAMES O [US], et al) [A] 3-5,44-46 * page 23, paragraph 211 - page 24 *; | [I]EP1278127 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [I] 17,31-34 * column 3, line 28 - line 32 * * column 13, line 6 - column 14, line 44; figure 7 * * column 24, line 13 - line 16 *; | [I] - (20040131), URL: www.lightningdownload.com/screens.shtml; /new.shtml; /whatsnew.shtml, (20060125), XP002364502 [I] 1-30,35-48 * the whole document * | [L] - (20030617), URL: http://www.pcmag.com/print_article2/0,1217,a=41979,00.asp, (20060125), XP002364503 [L] 1-30,35-48 * This citation confirms that the Lightning Download software was available on 17.06.2003. * | [I] - PRESENTING MESSAGES ON AN OBJECT THAT IS NOT CURRENTLY BEING WORKED ON, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 99-101, (19921101), ISSN 0018-8689, XP000314078 [I] 1,2,6-9,11-14,16,17,41-43,47,48 * the whole document * | [A] - APPLICATION-INITIATED MULTITASKING AND QUEUED TASK RECOGNITION, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 355-356, (19890301), ISSN 0018-8689, XP000051423 [A] 18 * page 356 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004191517 A 20040708 (KENWOOD CORP) [A] 34 * abstract * | Examination | JPH05189182 |