EP1774294 - A method and fluorometer for measuring the phase shift induced in a light signal by fluorescence emission by a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/16] | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE PHASE SHIFT INDUCED IN A LIGHT SIGNAL BY A SAMPLE | ||
[2015/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states PreciSense A/S Dr. Neergaards Vej 3 2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AASMUL, Søren Borg. Schneidersvej 60 DK-2840 Holte / DK | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/16] | Chandrani, Vandita Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05763136.8 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP08147 | Priority number, date | GB20040016732 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0416732 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010604 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774294 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774294 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27, G01N21/64, G01J3/44, G01N27/327 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,NO,US);
G01J3/4406 (EP,NO,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,NO,US);
G01N21/645 (EP,NO,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,NO,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,NO,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Fluorometer zur Messung der bei einem Lichtsignal durch eine Probe induzierten Phasenverschiebung in einer von der Probe emittierten Fluoreszenz | [2015/16] | English: | A method and fluorometer for measuring the phase shift induced in a light signal by fluorescence emission by a sample | [2015/16] | French: | Procédé et fluoromètre pour mesurer le décalage de phase induit dans un signal par l'émission de fluorescence d'un échantillon | [2015/16] |
Former [2007/16] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER BEI EINEM LICHTSIGNAL DURCH EINE PROBE INDUZIERTEN PHASENVERSCHIEBUNG | ||
Former [2007/16] | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE PHASE SHIFT INDUCED IN A LIGHT SIGNAL BY A SAMPLE | ||
Former [2007/16] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER LE DECALAGE DE PHASE INDUIT DANS UN SIGNAL LUMINEUX PAR UN ECHANTILLON | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2010 | 04.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10174768.1 / EP2256480 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2005 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | IE | 27.07.2015 | LU | 27.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | GB | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.07.2005 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/37] | HU | 27.07.2005 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2004114137 (MADER LUTZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,41 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0063]; figure 1 * [A] 4,9,18,21,22,33-36,43,47,50,58-60; | [YA]EP0453599 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,41 * column 12, line 2 - column 13, line 34; figure 5 * [A] 3-5,14,22,26,33-36,43,44,58-60; | [A]US5216483 (BERTHOLD JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1,41 * column 7, line 25 - column 9, line 5; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2004090622 (NIELSEN HANS OLE [DK], et al) [A] 1,41 * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0141]; figure 1 *; | [A]US5757013 (GROGER HOWARD P [US], et al) [A] 1,41 * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 64 *; | [A]EP0442295 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1,41 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 4; figure 1 * | Examination | WO2005033746 | US2003062485 | by applicant | US2004114137 | EP0453599 |