EP1769415 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanger Orthopedic Group, Inc. Two Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 1200 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPAETH, John, P. 18325 Rathbun Hills road St. Louis, MO 63069 / US | 02 /
KIRK, Thomas, F. 2616 Lighthouse Bend Drive Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082 / US | 03 /
WHITESIDE, Stacey 1119 W. Geneva Drive Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05763491.7 | 28.06.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US22964 | Priority number, date | US20040879653 | 28.06.2004 Original published format: US 879653 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006004773 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1769415 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/4099 (EP,US);
A61B5/0064 (EP,US);
A61B5/1077 (EP,US);
A61F2/5046 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN | [2007/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEDICAL DEVICES | [2007/14] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5969822 (FRIGHT WILLIAM R [NZ], et al); | [YP]US6722026 (LENT MATTHEW HARRIS [US]); | [YP]US6792370 (SATOH KIYOHIDE [JP], et al) |