EP1753291 - METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ANGIOGENESIS AND CELL PROLIFERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANYON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Executive Plaza One 11350 McCormick Road, Suite 400 Hunt Valley, MD 21031 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Cheng-Der Tony 9812 Whitney Drive, Apt. 324 Baltimore, MD 21237 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05763698.7 | 05.04.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US11549 | Priority number, date | US20040561741P | 12.04.2004 Original published format: US 561741 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005099749 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1753291 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/18, A61K38/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
A61K38/58 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/58, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON ANGIOGENESE UND ZELLPROLIFERATION | [2007/08] | English: | METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ANGIOGENESIS AND CELL PROLIFERATION | [2007/08] | French: | METHODES POUR CONTROLER UNE ANGIOGENESE ET UNE PROLIFERATION CELLULAIRE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CAUNT M ET AL, "Thrombin induces neoangiogenesis in the chick chrioallantoic membrane", JOURNAL OF THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, OXFORD, GB, (20030101), vol. 1, ISSN 1538-7933, pages 2097 - 2102, XP002467599 [X] 1-25 * page 2098 * * page 2100 - page 2101; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1538-7836.2003.00426.x | [X] - YAMAHATA HITOSHI ET AL, "The role of thrombin in the neo-vascularization of malignant gliomas: an intrinsic modulator for the up-regulation of vascular endothelial growth factor.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY MAY 2002, (200205), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 921 - 928, XP009118636 [X] 1-25 * page 924 - page 927; figure 4(B) * | [X] - DARMOUL D ET AL, "Aberrant expression and activation of the thrombin receptor protease-activated receptor-1 induces cell proliferation and motility in human colon cancer cells", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY,, (20030101), vol. 162, no. 5, pages 1503 - 1513, XP002529002 [X] 1-25 * page 1507; figure 5 * * page 1512 * | [A] - WARKENTIN THEODORE E, "Bivalent direct thrombin inhibitors: hirudin and bivalirudin.", BEST PRACTICE & RESEARCH. CLINICAL HAEMATOLOGY MAR 2004, (200403), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 1521-6926, pages 105 - 125, XP002533386 [A] * page 112 - page 114 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.beha.2004.02.002 | [PX] - HU LIANG ET AL, "Role of endogenous thrombin in tumor implantation, seeding, and spontaneous metastasis.", BLOOD 1 NOV 2004, (20041101), vol. 104, no. 9, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2746 - 2751, XP002533387 [PX] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-03-1047 | International search | [X]EP0503829 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al); | [Y] - ESUMI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, no. 17, pages 4549 - 4556, XP000128082 | [Y] - ALLEGRINI ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACOL, (2004), vol. 53, pages 261 - 266, XP003002323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-003-0712-y | [Y] - LOKICH ET AL., ANN. ONCOL., (1997), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 15 - 25, XP003002324 |