EP1774099 - PAPER PRODUCT WITH INCREASED RELATIVE WET TENSILE STRENGTH AND SOFTNESS METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FR
GB
GR
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 176 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FR
GB
GR
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 176 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 176 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORSBERG, Joachim Loewensteiner Ring 6 55286 Woerrstadt / DE | 02 /
BRUZZANO, Stefano Weinbergstr. 35 14469 Potsdam / DE | 03 /
LASCHEWSKY, André Am Sandberg 16 14469 Potsdam / DE | 04 /
SIEVERLING, Nathalie Weinbergstr. 35 14469 Potsdam / DE | 05 /
EICHHORN, Stephan Tannenstr. 25 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 06 /
STAPEL, Siegfried Altdammer Str. 6 68307 Mannheim / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764217.5 | 21.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP07962 | Priority number, date | DE20041038132 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004038132 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006015698 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774099 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774099 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/20 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C08G73/0206 (EP,US);
C08G73/024 (EP,US);
D21H17/53 (EP,US);
D21H17/56 (EP,US);
D21H21/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAPIERERZEUGNIS MIT ERHÖHTER RELATIVER NASSREISSFESTIGKEIT UND WEICHHEIT, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2007/16] | English: | PAPER PRODUCT WITH INCREASED RELATIVE WET TENSILE STRENGTH AND SOFTNESS METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2007/16] | French: | ARTICLE EN PAPIER PRESENTANT UNE SOUPLESSE ET UNE RESISTANCE A LA DECHIRURE A L'ETAT HUMIDE RELATIVE ACCRUES, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATION DUDIT ARTICLE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 23.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | IE | 09.01.2008 | LT | 09.01.2008 | LV | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | IS | 09.05.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | AT | 21.07.2008 | LU | 21.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
AT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
AT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
AT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | LT | 09.01.2008 | |
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | LT | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | LT | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19640205 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-23 * page 2, line 3 - line 23 *; | [DA]WO0040639 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-23 * page 1, line 3 - line 26 *; | [A]DE19909835 (SCA HYGIENE PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23 * page 4, line 44 - line 45 *; | [DA]DE69814359T (BAYER AG [US]) [DA] 1-23 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 11 - paragraph 12 * * page 4, paragraph 16 * * page 5, paragraph 20 *; | [PA]US2004149411 (KRUEGER ELLEN [DE], et al) [PA] 1-23 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 1, paragraph 15 - paragraph 19 * * page 1, paragraph 26 - page 2 ** page 3, paragraph 45 *; | [PA]DE10346750 (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1-23 * claim 14 * |