EP1778490 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MACHINE FOR PROCESSING SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [2017/51] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESE, Holger Golfstrasse 4 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 02 /
LINDNER, Bernd Hohebergstrasse 51 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | 03 /
SCHILD, Helmut Am Wingertsgrund 148 61449 Steinbach/Ts / DE | 04 /
KÜHLMEYER, Lothar Sandbergstr. 66 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
MARNETH, Bernd Reinheimer Strasse 71 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 06 /
BLUMÖR, Joachim Waldstrasse 12 63512 Hainburg / DE | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/51] |
Former [2014/26] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland sheetfed GmbH Intellectual Property (SRI) Mühlheimerstrasse 341 63075 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764308.2 | 28.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005EP08160 | Priority number, date | DE20041039536 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004039536 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006018105 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778490 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778490 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1778490 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/02, B41F13/004, B41F27/12 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B41F31/02 (EP,US);
B41F13/0045 (EP,US);
B41F27/1206 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | B41F33/00, B41F13/004 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER VERARBEITUNGSMASCHINE FÜR BOGENMATERIAL | [2013/49] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MACHINE FOR PROCESSING SHEET MATERIAL | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE MACHINE TRANSFORMATRICE DE MATERIAU EN FEUILLES | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/18] | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER VERARBEITUNGSMASCHINE F]R BOGENMATERIAL | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08007735.7 / EP1952987 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2014
17.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2014
17.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2014
17.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | 16.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.05.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.11.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/12] | 03.12.2012 | Resumption of proceedings | [2012/43] | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/43] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2005 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | IE | 28.07.2014 | LU | 28.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | AT | 28.07.2016 | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/24] | HU | 28.07.2005 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | HU | 28.07.2005 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.07.2005 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.07.2005 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5983793 (VOLZ ALBRECHT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, lines 30-57 * * column 4 * * column 5, lines 15-17 *; | [Y]DE4223583 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 15,16,30-33,37-41 *; | [DA]EP0812683 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10129555 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0024] , [0044] *; | [A]US5964157 (HUMMEL PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, lines 55-67 * * column 4, lines 1-32 *; | [A]US2004074409 (ROTHER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0149841 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 6-8 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0974461 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 6-8 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * | Examination | EP0435413 | by applicant | EP0812683 | US5983793 | EP0834398 | DE4223583 | DE10129555 | US5964157 | US2004074409 | Opposition | DE19650075 |