EP1779565 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING VIEWING INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH A DIGITAL MEDIA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nielsen Media Research, Inc. 770 N. Broadway New York, NY 10003 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONKLIN, Charles, A. 9050 Brooker Dr. New Port Richey, FL 34655 / US | 02 /
NIELSEN, Christen, V. 1740 Painted Bunting Circle Palm Harbor, FL 34683 / US | 03 /
MILAVSKY, Joseph, G. 1310 Weybridge Lane Dunedin, FL 34698 / US | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764664.8 | 01.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US23995 | Priority number, date | US20040584996P | 02.07.2004 Original published format: US 584996 P | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006014495 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779565 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H9/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H04H60/44 (EP,US);
H04H60/32 (EP,US);
H04H60/33 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/44218 (EP,US);
H04N21/44224 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON MIT EINER DIGITALEN MEDIA-EINRICHTUNG ASSOZIIERTEN BETRACHTUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2007/18] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING VIEWING INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH A DIGITAL MEDIA DEVICE | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREILS D'IDENTIFICATION D'INFORMATIONS DE VISUALISATION ASSOCIEES A UN DISPOSITIF SUPPORT NUMERIQUE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5034902 (STEINMANN MATTHIAS [CH]) [A] 5,7-9,17,18,20-22 * column 1, line 44 - line 57; claim 1 * * column 4, line 9 - line 13 ** column 4, line 36 - line 50 *; | [A]WO0011865 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 5-7,13,17,19,20,25 * page 11, line 21 - line 23 * * page 15, line 5 - line 16 * * page 20, line 7 - line 25 * * page 4, line 13 - line 15 * * page 14, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]US2002078441 (DRAKE EDDIE [US], et al) [A] 6,19 * paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2003005432 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 4,6,13,18,19,25 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0050] , [ 0051] *; | [X]WO2004051997 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9-14,16,18,22-26 * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0025] - [0027] - [ 0030] , [ 0039] , [ 0042]; claims 3, 8, 20, 28, 34, 43, 53, 55 * | International search | [A]US5034902 (STEINMANN MATTHIAS [CH]); | [A]US6202210 (LUDTKE HAROLD AARON [US]); | [Y]EP1100265 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US2002078441 (DRAKE EDDIE [US], et al); | [A]US2003005432 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US6704929 (OZER STUART [US], et al); | [X]WO2004051997 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al) |