EP1775120 - FINE PARTICLES OF TIN-MODIFIED RUTILE-TYPE TITANIUM DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIJIMA, Tomonori Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Norio Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Toyoharu Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2007/16] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05765178.8 | 29.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP12002 | Priority number, date | JP20040191966 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004191966 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006001487 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775120 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/20, C01G23/053, C09C1/36, C09C3/06, C09D17/00, C09D183/00, C09D4/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, G02B1/10 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C01G23/04 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G19/00 (KR);
C01G23/00 (KR);
C01G23/053 (EP,US);
C09C1/3607 (EP,US);
C09C1/3661 (EP,US);
C09C1/3684 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/002 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
G02B1/11 (US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/40] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEINE PARTIKEL VON ZINNMODIFIZIERTEM TITANDIOXID VOM RUTILTYP | [2007/16] | English: | FINE PARTICLES OF TIN-MODIFIED RUTILE-TYPE TITANIUM DIOXIDE | [2007/16] | French: | FINE PARTICULES DE DIOXYDE DE TITANE DE TYPE RUTILE MODIFIÉ À L"ÉTAIN | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | Translation filed | 19.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000204301 ; | [X]EP0499863 (KRONOS INT INC [DE]) [X] 1-5* page 4, line 25 - line 45; example 1; table 1 *; | [X]US5776239 (BRUNO SALVATORE ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-6 * example 6 *; | [X]EP0992456 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,12,15,19,21 * paragraphs [0024] , [0029] , [0042] , [0046] , [0082] , [0091] , [0094] , [0109] , [0001] - [0112] - [0115] , [0117] , [0119] , [0138] , [0168] *; | [X] - "COATING SOLUTION FOR FORMING COVERED FILM AND LENS MADE OF SYNTHETIC RESIN", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, Database accession no. 001526, XP002551503 & JP2000204301 A 20000725 (SHOKUBAI KASEI KOGYO KG) [X] 1-21 * column A * | International search | [A]JPH02255532 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO); | [A]JPH09175821 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) | by applicant | JPH09110956 | JP2783417B | JP2001123115 | JP2002194083 |