EP1825893 - GAME DEVICE, COMPUTER CONTROL METHOD, AND INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Eiji c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | 02 /
IZUMI, Tadakatsu c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Ippei c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | 04 /
MIZUTANI, Atsushi c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Eiji c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | ||
02 /
IZUMI, Tadakatsu c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | |||
03 /
KONDO, Ippei c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | |||
04 /
MIZUTANI, Atsushi c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | |||
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Eiji, c/oKonami Digit. Entert. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | ||
02 /
IZUMI, Tadakatsu, Konami Digit. Entert.Co., Ltd 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | |||
03 /
KONDO, Ippei, c/o Konami Digit. Entert. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | |||
04 /
MIZUTANI, Atsushi, Konami Digit. Entert. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/35] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765270.3 | 04.07.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005JP12342 | Priority number, date | JP20040358490 | 10.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004358490 | [2007/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061922 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1825893 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1825893 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
A63F13/537 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/44 (EP,KR);
A63F13/573 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/812 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/303 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/638 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/12] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPIELVORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERSTEUERVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2007/35] | English: | GAME DEVICE, COMPUTER CONTROL METHOD, AND INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM | [2007/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JEU, PROCEDE DE CONTROLE INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | Translation filed | 14.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 19.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001008840 (SUGIMOTO NORIHIDE [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0111] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2004176165 (TAKAHASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0023]; figures 3-5 *; | [X] - MICROSOFT GAME STUDIOS, "Links 2004", GAME MANUAL, (20031111), URL: http://assets.xbox.com/en-us/GameManuals/Links2004_Manual_EN.pdf, XP002457959 [X] 1-6 * page 17 * | [L] - MICROSOFT GAME STUDIOS, "Links 2004 release date data", GAMESPOT GAMEFAQS, (20031111), URL: http://www.gamefaqs.com/console/xbox/data/914918.html, (20071108), XP002457960 [L] * page 1 * | International search | [A]JP2002292131 (KONAMI CO LTD); | [A]JP2003159547 (AMANO CORP); | [A]JP2003265859 (SQUARE ENIX CO LTD); | [A]JP2004216165 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC); | [A]JP2004290657 (NINTENDO CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2004321303 (NINTENDO CO LTD, et al); | [A] - "KONAMI OFFICIAL GUIDE Perfect Series J. LEAGUE Jikkyo Winning Eleven 2001 Perfect Guide.", (20010829), pages 24 - 34, XP002999591 | [A] - FIGHTING STUDIO ET AL, "GameCube Kanpeki Koryaku Series 3 Virtua Striker 3 ver.2002 Road to International Cup Kyukyoku Guide.", (20020325), pages 10 - 17, XP002999592 | by applicant | US2001008840 |