EP1788709 - LDPC CODE CREATING METHOD, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND CODE SEQUENCE CREATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Shigeru Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | 02 /
OTSUKA, Akira Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Wataru Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
UCHIDA, Shigeru, Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | ||
02 /
OTSUKA, Akira, Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Wataru, Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765754.6 | 13.07.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP12949 | Priority number, date | JP20040012830 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004012830 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027897 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788709 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/25, H03M13/11 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H03M13/118 (EP);
H03M13/033 (EP);
H03M13/1185 (EP);
H03M13/255 (EP);
H03M13/353 (EP);
H03M13/356 (EP);
H03M13/616 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | H03M13/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/50] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LPDC-CODE-ERZEUGUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODE-SEQUENZ-ERZEUGUNG | [2007/21] | English: | LDPC CODE CREATING METHOD, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND CODE SEQUENCE CREATING METHOD | [2007/21] | French: | MÉTHODE DE CRÉATION DE CODE LDPC, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET MÉTHODE DE CRÉATION DE SÉQUENCE DE CODE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2007 | Translation filed | 09.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - RICHARDSON T. ET AL., "Multi-edge type LDPC codes", (20040420), pages 1 - 36, URL: http://lthcwww.epfl.ch, XP002992932 [X] 1-4,11 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 9, paragraph L - page 11 * * page 21, paragraph L * * page 25, paragraph L - page 27 * [A] 5-10,12-18 | [XA] - PISHRO-NIK H ET AL, "Results on non-uniform error correction using low-density parity-check codes", PROC., IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, GLOBECOM 2003, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, (20031201), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-7974-9, pages 2041 - 2045, XP010677716 [X] 1-4,11 * page 2042 - page 2045 * [A] 5-10,12-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2003.1258595 | [XA] - JILEI HOU ET AL, "Capacity-approaching bandwidth-efficient coded modulation schemes based on low-density parity-check codes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE, US, (20030901), vol. 49, no. 9, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2141 - 2155, XP011100214 [X] 1-4,11 * page 2149, column R * [A] 5-10,12-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2003.815777 | [XA] - RAVI NARAYANASWAMI, "Coded Modulation with low density parity check codes", THESIS SUBMITTED TO THE OFFICE OF GRADUATE STUDIES OF TEXAS A&MUNIVERSITY IN PARTIAL FULFILLMENT OF THE REQUIREMENTS FOR THEDEGREE OF MASTER OF SCIENCE, (20010601), pages 1 - 77, XP002271230 [X] 1-4,11 * page 25 - page 40 * [A] 5-10,12-18 | [PX] - SANKAR H ET AL, "Design of low-density parity-check (LDPC) codes for high order constellations", PROC., IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, GLOBECOM '04, DALLAS, TX, USA, (20041129), vol. 5, ISBN 978-0-7803-8794-2, pages 3113 - 3117, XP010758295 [PX] 1-4,11 * page 3114 - page 3115 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2004.1378925 | [A] - BA-ZHONG SHEN ET AL, "Low-density parity-check coded modulation using multiple signal maps and symbol decoding", PROC., IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, ICC 2004, PARIS, FRANCE, (20040620), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8533-7, pages 420 - 424, XP010710022 [A] 1-18 * page 421, column R - page 422, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2004.1312523 | [A] - KHANDEKAR A ET AL, "Irregular repeat accumulate codes for non-binary modulation schemes", PROC., IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION THEORY, ISIT 02, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND, (20020630), ISBN 978-0-7803-7501-7, page 171, XP010601883 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIT.2002.1023443 | International search | [A]JP2003198383 ; | [A] - CHUNG SY. ET AL, "Analysis of Sum-Product Decoding of Low-Density Parity-Check Codes Using a Gaussian Approximation.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS IN INFORMATION THEORY., (200102), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 657 - 670, XP002969535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.910580 | [A] - RICHARDSON T. ET AL, "Multi-edge type LDPC codes, On the occasion of Bob McEliece's 60th birthday celebration.", (20030203), pages 1 - 52, URL: http://www.systems.caltech.edu/~jeremy/research/other_papers/McEliece_bday.pdf_1.pdf, XP002992931 | [A] - RICHARDSON T. ET AL, "Multi-Edge Type LDPC codes.", (20040120), pages 1 - 36, URL: http://ece.iisc.ernet.in/~vijay/multiedge.pdf, XP002992932 | [A] - WADAYAMA T. ET AL, "A Coded Modulation Scheme Based on Low Density Parity Check Codes.", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS., (200110), vol. E84, pages 2523 - 2527, XP001107784 | by applicant | - RICHARDSON T. ET AL., MULTI-EDGE TYPE LDPC CODES, (20040420), pages 1 - 36 |