EP1782775 - HEAT GENERATING BODY AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mycoal Products Corporation 388, Minagawajounai-cho Tochigi-chi, Tochigi 328-0067 / JP | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODO, Toshihiro, MYCOAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION 388, Minagawajounai-cho Tochigi-shi, Tochigi 328-0067 / JP | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765768.6 | 14.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005JP13004 | Priority number, date | JP20040207832 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004207832 | [2007/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006651 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782775 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/08, C09K5/16 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61F7/034 (EP,US);
C09K5/18 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0098 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/43] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRME ERZEUGENDER KÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/19] | English: | HEAT GENERATING BODY AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2007/19] | French: | CORPS GÉNÉRATEUR DE CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2007 | Translation filed | 12.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2003334212 (MAIKOORU KK); | [Y]JP2003336042 (MAIKOORU KK); | [A]JP2002155273 (USUI KAORU); | [Y]JP2004024671 (MAIKOORU KK); | [Y]JPH0558123U ; | [Y]JP3007467U |