EP1774806 - TERMINAL FOR MULTIMEDIA RING BACK TONE SERVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower, 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Seongsoo 203, 837-15, Hwagok 4-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-902 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sangshin 55-20 Guui 2-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-817 / KR | 03 /
WOO, Daesic 513, Benepia Officetel 345-2 Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-828 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seongkeun 601-201, Mokdong 6-danji Apt. Mok 6-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-756 / KR | 05 /
OH, Sehyun 9-1202, Gaepo Woosung 1cha Apt. 503 Daechi1- dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-828 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Myungsung 1605 Hyun-dai Green Apt. 964 Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-862 / KR | [2012/22] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
PARK, Seongsoo 203, 837-15, Hwagok 4-dong Gangseo-gu, Seoul 157-902 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Sangshin 55-20 Guui 2-dong Gwangjin-gu, Seoul 143-817 / KR | |||
03 /
WOO, Daesic 513, Benepia Officetel 345-2 Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-828 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Seongkeun 601-201, Mokdong 6-danji Apt. Mok 6-dong Yangcheon-gu, Seoul 158-756 / KR | |||
05 /
OH, Sehyun 9-1202, Gaepo Woosung 1cha Apt., 503 Daechi1- dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-828 / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Myungsung 1605 Hyun-dai Green Apt., 964 Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-862 / KR | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hassa, Oliver Michael, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Hassa, Oliver Michael, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstraße 31 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765882.5 | 08.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005KR02199 | Priority number, date | KR20040055531 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004055531 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006009362 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774806 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774806 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, // H04M7/00 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04M3/42017 (EP,US);
H04M7/0072 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT FÜR MULTIMEDIA-RÜCKRUFTONDIENST UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ENDGERÄTS | [2007/16] | English: | TERMINAL FOR MULTIMEDIA RING BACK TONE SERVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TERMINAL | [2007/16] | French: | TERMINAL POUR SERVICE DE RETOUR DE TONALITE MULTIMEDIA ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU TERMINAL | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 30.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2005 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MC | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004016021 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 6 - page 6, line 3 ** page 8, line 2 - page 11, line 31 *; | [A]US2004120494 (JIANG SHAONING [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * | International search | [A]KR20000046525 (DAEWOO TELECOM LTD); | [A]US6574335 (KALMANEK JR CHARLES ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]KR20030057494 (UTOFOS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20040033425 (WIDERTHAN COM CO LTD); | [XE]KR20050075830 (DINNOVAN CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO2004016021 | US2004120494 |