EP1743483 - MULTI-DESCRIPTION CODING FOR VIDEO DELIVERY OVER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Hui 80 Shields Lane Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05766035.9 | 05.05.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005US15855 | Priority number, date | US20040568454P | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 568454 P | US20040939219 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: US 939219 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005109881 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1743483 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/12, H04N7/26 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
H04N21/64784 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/39 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/03] | H04N7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHBESCHREIBENDE KODIERUNG FÜR VIDEOLIEFERUNG ÜBER NETZWERKE | [2007/03] | English: | MULTI-DESCRIPTION CODING FOR VIDEO DELIVERY OVER NETWORKS | [2007/03] | French: | CODAGE A MULTIPLES DESCRIPTIONS POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE DONNEES VIDEO SUR DES RESEAUX | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 30.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003072376 (KRISHNAMACHARI SANTHANA [US], et al) [A] 7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0018] - [0021] * * figure 1 *; | [IA] - KARCZEWICZ M ET AL, "The SP- and SI-frames design for H.264/AVC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, US, (200307), vol. 13, no. 7, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 637 - 644, XP011099256 [I] 1,8,10 * abstract * * page 637, column l, line 1 - line l * * page 638, column l, line 21 - page 639, column l, line 5 * * page 639, column l, line 33 - page 640, column l, line 29; figures 2,4 * [A] 2,3,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.814969 | [A] - NAGHSHINEH M ET AL, "End-to-End QoS Provisioning in Multimedia Wireless/Mobile Networks Using an Adaptive Framework", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, US, (199711), vol. 35, no. 11, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 72 - 81, XP000723638 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.634764 | [IP] - BOYCE J M ET AL, "Fast Efficient Channel Change", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS (ICCE 2005), IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, US, (20050108), no. 1.1-1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8838-3, pages 1 - 2, XP010796400 [IP] 1-10 * page 1, column l, line 1 - line l * * page 1, column r, line 26 - page 2, column r, line 6 * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE.2005.1429586 | International search | [X]US5603012 (SOTHERAN MARTIN W [GB]) |