EP1781396 - LIQUID FILTER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/19] | LIQUID FILTER ARRANGEMENT AND METHODS | ||
[2011/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street, P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRECO, Enrico Via Roselli, 20 Villa Poma, Mantova, 46035 / IT | 02 /
FORMICA, Claudio F. Cavallotti, 24 I-46030 Pomponesco / IT | 03 /
BURATTO, Fabrizio Via Breda, 313 Sustinente, Mantova, 46030 / IT | 04 /
CANTONI, Mauro Via Arrivabene 20 Mantova, 46100 / IT | 05 /
GUERNIERI, Christian Via Mantegna 18 Revere Mantova, 46036 / IT | 06 /
CONNELLY, John Francis 900 Saddlebrook Curve Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | 07 /
HACKER, John R. 5617 Harriet Ave. So. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766072.2 | 16.06.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US21273 | Priority number, date | US20040583873P | 29.06.2004 Original published format: US 583873 P | US20040609602P | 13.09.2004 Original published format: US 609602 P | US20050659592P | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 659592 P | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006012031 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781396 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781396 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/153 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B01D35/153 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (US);
B01D35/143 (EP,US);
B01D35/147 (EP);
B01D35/1573 (US);
B01D2201/167 (US);
B01D2201/291 (US);
B01D2201/295 (EP,US);
B01D2201/302 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D35/143, B01D35/147, B01D35/153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTERANORDNUNG | [2011/18] | English: | LIQUID FILTER ARRANGEMENT | [2011/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILTRE A LIQUIDE | [2011/18] |
Former [2007/19] | FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTERANORDNUNG UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2007/19] | LIQUID FILTER ARRANGEMENT AND METHODS | ||
Former [2007/19] | SYSTEME DE FILTRE A LIQUIDE ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182618.8 / EP2316556 | EP14172879.0 / EP2865432 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2005 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 16.06.2012 | LU | 16.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
LU | 16.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2471803 (MANITOU BF [FR]) [A] 1,10,16* the whole document *; | [X]US2002017497 (FRITZE KARL [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0045]; figure 11 *; | [X]US2003127384 (KAPUR DESH [US]) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * figure - * |