EP1787720 - CATALYST FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GAS CONTAINING ORGANIC NITROGEN COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING SUCH EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. 6-3, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8563 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. 6-3, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8563 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKOMA, Tomoo@Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | 02 /
SAKURAI, Takanobu@Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | 03 /
NAKANO, Yoshiki@Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
IKOMA, Tomoo Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKURAI, Takanobu Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKANO, Yoshiki Nikki-Universal Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Research Center, 7-14-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540014 / JP | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2016/44] |
Former [2009/49] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/21] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05766375.9 | 15.07.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP13171 | Priority number, date | JP20040208279 | 15.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004208279 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006702 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787720 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787720 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02, B01J21/06, B01J23/42, B01J29/24, B01J29/46, B01J37/04, B01D53/86, B01J29/072, B01J29/076, B01J29/26, B01J35/02 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
B01J29/24 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/86 (KR);
B01D53/8621 (EP,US);
B01D53/8634 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,US);
B01J29/076 (EP,US);
B01J29/26 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | B01J29/24, B01D53/86, B01J29/26, B01J29/46, B01J37/04, B01J23/89 | ||
Former IPC [2007/21] | B01J29/24, B01D53/86, B01J29/26, B01J29/46, B01J37/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2016/44] |
Former [2007/43] | DE, GB, NL | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGASEN MIT STICKSTOFFVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG SOLCHER ABGASE | [2007/21] | English: | CATALYST FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GAS CONTAINING ORGANIC NITROGEN COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING SUCH EXHAUST GAS | [2007/21] | French: | CATALYSEUR UTILISE POUR PURIFIER UN GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT CONTENANT UN COMPOSE AZOTE ORGANIQUE ET PROCEDE D'EPURATION D'UN TEL GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2007 | Translation filed | 13.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.11.2016 | [2017/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0514729 (SOLVAY CATALYSTS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-12,14,15 * claims 1-5,12 * * page 2, lines 53-56 *; | [X]US5358916 (SHIOKAWA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * claims 1-7,10 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 4 * * column 5, lines 9-16 * * examples 9,12, comp.5, comp.7 *; | [A]EP0800855 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-12,14,15 * page 3, lines 38-44 * * page 4, lines 9-14 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]JPH10249165 (ICHIKAWA MASARU, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0006]; examples 8,20,21 *; | [X]WO03051493 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,12 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 13 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 21 * * page 13, lines 3-5 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - G BUSCA, "Abatement of ammonia and amines from waste gases: a summary", JOURNAL OF LOSS PREVENTION IN THE PROCESS INDUSTRIES, (20030301), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0950-4230(02)00093-1, ISSN 0950-4230, pages 157 - 163, XP055003448 [A] 1,2,4,5,8-12,14,15 * page 159, paragraph 2.3. - page 160 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-4230(02)00093-1 | International search | [X]JPH06334 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK); | [A]JPH07328440 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [A]JPH08309152 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH09299461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP3485350B | Examination | JPH07284670 | by applicant | JPH07284670 | JPH08173766 | EP0800855 | JP2001293480 |