EP1786345 - APPARATUS FOR CREATING A LINEAR ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/21] | CATHETER, APPARATUS FOR CREATING A LINEAR ABLATION AND A METHOD OF ABLATING TISSUE | ||
[2012/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plymouth Hospitals NHS Trust Derriford Hospital Plymouth PL6 8DH / GB | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYWOOD, Guy Danish Perch Lower Kelly Calstock Cornwall PL18 9RY / GB | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
HAYWOOD, Guy Danish Perch, Lower Kelly, Calstock Cornwall PL18 9RY / GB | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/21] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05766667.9 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005GB02895 | Priority number, date | GB20040016713 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0416713 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010908 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786345 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786345 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/02 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00273 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER LINEAREN ABLATION | [2013/17] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CREATING A LINEAR ABLATION | [2013/17] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CRÉER UNE ABLATION LINÉAIRE | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/21] | KATHETER, VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER LINEAREN ABLATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTRAGEN VON GEWEBE | ||
Former [2007/21] | CATHETER, APPARATUS FOR CREATING A LINEAR ABLATION AND A METHOD OF ABLATING TISSUE | ||
Former [2007/21] | CATHETER, APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CREER UNE ABLATION LINEAIRE ET PROCEDE D'ABLATION DE TISSU | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2007 | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2005 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IE | 25.07.2013 | LU | 25.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0067832 (ATRIONIX INC [US]) [X] 28 * page 22, line 34 - page 23, line 7; figure 10 * [A] 1; | [X]US5487385 (AVITALL BOAZ [US]) [X] 28 * column 5, line 19 - line 65; figure 8 *; | [A]EP1430848 (CRYOCOR INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2003135207 (LANGBERG JONATHAN J [US], et al) [A] * column A; figure 1a * | Examination | US2004204705 | WO2004091416 | by applicant | US5423807 | US5281213 | US5281215 | WO0032126 | WO9837822 | EP1129670 | WO9952455 | US6595989 |