EP1753984 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX FOR CONTROL OF LOCK-UP AND LOCK-UP RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states RENAULT S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURPIN, Thomas 12 rue Charles de Gaulle, Bât. B2 F-91400 ORSAY / FR | 02 /
CANIEZ, Laurent 22 rue Labrouste F-75015 PARIS / FR | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
TURPIN, Thomas 12 rue Charles de Gaulle, Bât. B2 F-91400 ORSAY / FR | ||
02 /
CANIEZ, Laurent 5 rue d'Arsonval F-75015 PARIS / FR | Application number, filing date | 05766702.4 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005FR50379 | Priority number, date | FR20040005775 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: FR 0405775 | [2007/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005118328 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753984 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1753984 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/14, F16H59/46 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H61/143 (EP,US);
F16H63/50 (EP,US);
B60W10/026 (EP,US);
B60W2030/18081 (EP,US);
F16H2059/467 (EP,US);
F16H2306/54 (EP,US);
Y02T10/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUTOMATIKGETRIEBES ZUR STEUERUNG VON SPERRUNG UND ENTSPERRUNG | [2007/08] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX FOR CONTROL OF LOCK-UP AND LOCK-UP RELEASE | [2007/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE BOITE DE VITESSES AUTOMATISEE POUR PILOTER LES PONTAGES ET DEPONTAGES. | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BG | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | LU | 26.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
LU | 26.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/12] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5547438 (NOZAKI KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5989156 (MATSUBARA TOORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6042507 (GENISE THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]US6449550 (LUTZ OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6468183 (O'NEIL BRIAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * column 11, line 40 - column 12, line 65; figures 1-21 * [A] 6,7; | [A]DE10242821 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |