EP1766964 - IMAGE CAPTURE METHOD AND IMAGE CAPTURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Fund 83 LLC 7251 W Lake Mead Boulevard Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2013/18] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Kunihiko 23-11, Naka-ohshio, Chino-shi Nagano / JP | 02 /
YAJIMA, Minoru 23-11, Naka-ohshio, Chino-shi Nagano / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT 61/1 71102 Chalon sur Sâone Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05766952.5 | 29.06.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US23042 | Priority number, date | JP20040194911 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004194911 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004810 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766964 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/217 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H04N23/673 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDERFASSUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2007/13] | English: | IMAGE CAPTURE METHOD AND IMAGE CAPTURE DEVICE | [2007/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITF DE SAISIE D'IMAGES | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001024931 ; | [DA]JPH06197260 ; | [DA]JPH01307710 ; | US5915047 [ ] (MURAMOTO TOMOTAKA [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001024931 A 20010126 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 4-6 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941019), vol. 018, no. 549, Database accession no. (E - 1618), & JP06197260 A 19940715 (CANON INC) [DA] 1,2,8 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900226), vol. 014, no. 104, Database accession no. (P - 1013), & JP01307710 A 19891212 (CANON INC) [DA] 1,2,8 * abstract * |