EP1759124 - PROTECTED STABILIZER LINK OR TIE ROD AND BALL RACE PROTECTING CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG Postfach 1220 49441 Lemförde / DE | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEARING, Daniel 3605 Linwood Royal Oak, Michigan 48073 / US | 02 /
COLE, Michael 15811 Centennial Drive Northville, Michigan 48167 / US | 03 /
MCBROOM, Ryan 15811 Centennial Drive Northville, Michigan 48167 / US | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 05767475.6 | 24.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005US22771 | Priority number, date | US20040875834 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: US 875834 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006002423 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759124 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, F16C9/04 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
F16C11/0604 (EP,US);
F16C11/06 (KR);
F16C11/0642 (EP,US);
F16C11/0685 (EP,US);
F16C17/24 (EP,US);
F16C11/0633 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32631 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32721 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32729 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32737 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHÜTZTE STABILISATORVERBINDUNG ODER ZUGSTANGE UND SCHUTZKAPPE FÜR EINEN KUGELLAGERLAUFRING | [2007/10] | English: | PROTECTED STABILIZER LINK OR TIE ROD AND BALL RACE PROTECTING CAP | [2007/10] | French: | CAPUCHON DE PROTECTION POUR STABILISATEUR OU BIELLETTE ET BAGUE DE ROULEMENT A BILLES | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1121570 (EHRENREICH & CIE A) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-14,16-19 * page 3 - page 4 * * figures 8-11 *; | [A]US2910316 (DIER STEPHEN A) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12,14,16,18,19 * figure - *; | [A]DE3308457 (ITW ATECO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,12,16 * figure - *; | [DA]US4577987 (BUHL REIHARD [DE], et al) [DA] 1,7,12,16* the whole document *; | [DA]DE3639962 (TRW EHRENREICH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5011321 (KIDOKORO SUSUMU [JP]) [DA] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4420488 (TRW FAHRWERKSYST GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5492427 (ERSOY METIN [DE], et al) [DA] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5613792 (TERADA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [AD] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6287040 (FISCHER MARKUS [DE]) [DA] 1,7,12,16 * the whole document * |