EP1779003 - BALL SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERLÄNGER, Jürgen Tannscharn 21 91448 Emskirchen / DE | 02 /
ADLER, Dieter Karl-Broeger-Strasse 34 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
KRAUS, Manfred Goethestrasse 36e 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 04 /
MAYER, Ralf Tannenweg 10 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2007/18] | Application number, filing date | 05767860.9 | 29.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005EP08227 | Priority number, date | DE20041040362 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004040362 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006021286 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779003 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779003 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/22, B62D5/04 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B62D5/0448 (EP);
F16H25/2214 (EP);
F16H55/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/38] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUGELGEWINDETRIEB | [2007/18] | English: | BALL SCREW | [2007/18] | French: | VIS D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À BILLES | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 21.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5193409 (BABINSKI ET AL) [X] 1-4 * figures 2,7 *; | [X]SU1627773 (FERDMAN ILYA A,SU; MARCHENKO VLADIMIR A,SU; TIMCHENKO VLADIMIR V,SU; S) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE1808328 (AKTIEBOLAGET SVENSKA KULLAGERFABRIKEN; AKTIEBOLAGET SVENSKA KULLAGERFA) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,3 * * figure 1 * [A] 8,9; | [X]JPH06201013 ; | [X]US5555770 (DOLATA ET AL) [X] 1-3 * figures 3,5 *; | [X]EP0418999 (DANA CORPORATION) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]DE3635212 (KAMMERER GMBH GEWINDETECHNIK; KAMMERER GMBH GEWINDETECHNIK, 7740 TRIBE) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US5005436 (BRUSASCO ET AL) [X] 1 * figure 13 *; | [X]US3367201 (ORNER HARRY) [X] 1-3 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5121647 (TERAMACHI ET AL) [A] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS59131059 ; | [A]JPS5993557 ; | [A]EP0133003 (NIPPON SEIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE10016197 (SHOWA CORPORATION, SAITAMA) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10312228 (NSK LTD., TOKIO/TOKYO) [AD] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941027), vol. 018, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1693), & JP06201013 A 19940719 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841127), vol. 008, no. 258, Database accession no. (M - 340), & JP59131059 A 19840727 (HIROSHI TERAMACHI) [A] 1,4-6,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840918), vol. 008, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 326), & JP59093557 A 19840530 (HIROSHI TERAMACHI) [A] 1,4,8,9 * abstract * |