EP1779165 - TUBE BUNDLE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SUCH BUNDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emtelle UK Limited Haughhead Hawick TD9 8LF / GB | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, George Henry Platt Braeholm, Windyknowe Road Galashiels TD1 1RQ / GB | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Williams, Bryn David Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05767915.1 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005GB02945 | Priority number, date | GB20040017982 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0417982 | GB20040017981 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0417981 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016104 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779165 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G02B6/4459 (EP,US);
G02B6/44 (KR);
G02B6/44384 (EP,US);
G02B6/4486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖHRENBÜNDEL FÜR OPTISCHE FASERN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN BÜNDELS | [2007/18] | English: | TUBE BUNDLE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SUCH BUNDLE | [2007/18] | French: | FAISCEAU TUBULAIRE POUR FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PROC)D) DE FABRICATION DE CE FAISCEAU | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 26.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62102211 ; | [X]US5157752 (GREVELING JOHANNES I [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,20,27 * figures 1,8 * * column 2, line 6 - line 26 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 38 *; | [X]US5325457 (BOTTOMS JR JACK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,27,29 * figures 1,4 * * column 7, line 40 - column 9, line 3 *; | [X]US5642452 (GRAVELY RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,20-22,24,25,27,33 * figure - * * column 2, line 33 - line 38 * * column 1, line 53 - line 65 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 22 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 25 *; | [X]EP1011000 (SIECOR OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1,16,21,22,24,25,27,33 * figure 2; claim 1 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 32 *; | [X]WO0242822 (CORNING CABLE SYS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,27,31-33 * page 4, line 10 - line 23 * * page 6, line 18 - line 24 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 25 * * page 11, line 9 - line 13 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 2 * * figure 7 *; | [X]EP1271213 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,8,27 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 32 - line 47 * * column 5, line 21 - line 30 *; | [X]US2003123823 (PARK EUY-DON [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,16-18,21,22,24,25,27 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [X]US6671441 (BOCANEGRA LUIS M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11,12,14,21-24,27,28,30,33 * figures 4,5 * * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 31 * * column 6, line 43 - line 51 *; | [X]EP1411378 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-5,19,22,27,33 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 5-7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871012), vol. 011, no. 311, Database accession no. (P - 625), & JP62102211 A 19870512 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [A] 1,2,13,15,27 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003035635 |