EP1784236 - INHALATION DEVICE COMPRISING A BLISTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | BLISTER ASSEMBLY FOR INHALATION DEVICE | ||
[2017/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar France SAS Lieudit le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | [2012/37] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Valois SAS BP G, Le Prieuré F - 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUONIAM, Michel 3, rue des Murs Fleuris F-27320 La Madeleine de Nonancourt / FR | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/43] |
Former [2007/20] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05767982.1 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP53313 | Priority number, date | FR20040051480 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0451480 | [2007/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010704 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784236 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784236 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M15/0051 (EP,US);
B65D83/0472 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/43] |
Former [2007/32] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER BLISTERPACKUNG | [2017/22] | English: | INHALATION DEVICE COMPRISING A BLISTER ASSEMBLY | [2017/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE DE BLISTERS | [2017/22] |
Former [2007/20] | BLISTERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/20] | BLISTER ASSEMBLY FOR INHALATION DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/20] | ENSEMBLE DE BLISTERS POUR DISPOSITIF D"INHALATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.10.2017 | GB | 11.07.2018 | [2019/21] |
Former [2018/41] | IT | 25.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0467172 (PROMO PACK SA [CH]) [X] 6,7 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 16 * * column 7, lines 34-48 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]US5497763 (LLOYD LESTER J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5794613 (PISKORSKI WALTER [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 43-46 * * column 6, lines 11-22 * * figures 3-7 *; | [A]WO0172605 (DURA PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 14 * * figures 43-47 *; | [PX]WO2004103446 (INNOVATA BIOMED LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,4,5* page 11, lines 9-12; figure 22 * |