EP1790059 - METHOD FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/22] | METHOD FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | ||
[2009/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Wolfgang Moerikestr. 7 77746 Schutterwald / DE | 02 /
FOERSTERA, Josef Albert-Baeuerle-Weg 1 77830 Buehlertal / DE | 03 /
HEIDRICH, Markus Carl-Netter-Strasse 5b 77815 Buehl / DE | [2007/22] | Application number, filing date | 05768013.4 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005EP53105 | Priority number, date | DE20041042271 | 01.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004042271 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006024564 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790059 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790059 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/04, H02K5/26, H02K21/28, H02K11/04 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K5/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, HU, IT [2007/49] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ELEKTROMOTORS | [2009/28] | English: | METHOD FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2009/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LOGER UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2009/28] |
Former [2007/22] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ELEKTROMOTORS | ||
Former [2007/22] | METHOD FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | ||
Former [2007/22] | DISPOSITIF POUR LOGER UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2008 | 21.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10313565 ; | [A]JPH1118373 ; | [X]US4453097 (LORDO ROBERT E [US]) [X] 11 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 49; figures 3,5,6,8 *; | [Y]US5412267 (OKADA KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 7,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0007279 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * page 6, line 33 - page 9, line 31; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004108779 (BOETTGER AXEL [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2,4a,4b * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10313565 A 19981124 (CANON PRECISION INC; CANON INC) [Y] 1-7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11018373 A 19990122 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |