EP1768880 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE BRAKE WITH A BRAKE STAND-BY FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/39] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROITZSCH, Stephan Rosenbrunnenstrasse 26/1 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
CRESS, Torsten Brückenstrasse 34 36381 Schlüchtern / DE | [2007/14] | Application number, filing date | 05768052.2 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005EP53524 | Priority number, date | DE20041035378 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004035378 | [2007/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006008309 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768880 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768880 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/12, B60T8/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B60T8/4854 (EP,US);
B60T7/12 (EP,US);
B60T8/3275 (EP,US);
B60T8/4077 (EP,US);
B60T2201/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/44] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FAHRZEUGBREMSE MIT EINER BREMSBEREITSCHAFTSFUNKTION | [2007/14] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE BRAKE WITH A BRAKE STAND-BY FUNCTION | [2007/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN FREIN DE VEHICULE, A FONCTION DE RESERVE | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19912878 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 31; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10148534 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19629229 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 45 * * figure - * |