EP1788081 - REAGENT CONTAINING PROTEASE REACTION PROMOTER AND/OR COLORANT STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Pharma Corporation 9-1, Kanda Mitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8481 / JP | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUZUMA, Takuji 4671-2, Wakamatsu-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka 4110025 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Yoko 412-3-202, Kona Izunokuni-shi, Shizuoka 4102201 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Shigeyuki 236-3, Mifuku Izunokuni-shi, Shizuoka 4102321 / JP | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
KOUZUMA, Takuji 4671-2, Wakamatsu-cho, Mishima-shi, Shizuoka 4110025 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAI, Yoko 412-3-202, Kona, Izunokuni-shi, Shizuoka 4102201 / JP | |||
03 /
IMAMURA, Shigeyuki 236-3, Mifuku, Izunokuni-shi, Shizuoka 4102321 / JP | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05768432.6 | 04.08.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP14291 | Priority number, date | JP20040229498 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004229498 | JP20040281226 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004281226 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013921 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788081 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/50, C12N9/96, C12N9/08, C12Q1/37, C12Q1/28, G01N33/72 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/723 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N2333/95 (EP,US);
G01N2333/964 (EP,US);
Y10T436/108331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAGENS MIT PROTEASEREAKTIONSPROMOTOR UND/ODER FARBSTOFFSTABILISATOR | [2007/21] | English: | REAGENT CONTAINING PROTEASE REACTION PROMOTER AND/OR COLORANT STABILIZER | [2007/21] | French: | REACTIF CONTENANT UN PROMOTEUR DE REACTION DE PROTEASE ET/OU UN STABILISATEUR DE COLORANTS | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2007 | Translation filed | 05.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 22.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5792736 (NAKAYAMA HISAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,17,20,21 * the whole document * * in particular: * * column 3, line 21 - line 33 * * claim 1 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]GB2348433 (ILFORD IMAGING UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * page 6, line 5 - line 12 *; | [X]WO0118165 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,17,18,20,21 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 4, line 7 - line 29 * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 2 * * page 23, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 1,3,8-10 *; | [X]EP1308787 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * claim 3 * * paragraph [0013] *; | [X]US2003175232 (ELLIOTT RUSSELL PHILLIP [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,17,20,21* paragraph [0166] *; | [A] - WISS O, "Research on the proteases. I. Amino-acids, hydrocyanic acid and pyro-phosphates as pepsin-activators", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA 1946, (1946), vol. 29, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 237 - 246, XP002490745 [A] 1,8,20,21 * the whole document * * in particular: * * abstract * * tables 3-5,8,10-12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19460290134 | [A] - VEIERSKOV B ET AL, "METABOLISM OF OAT AVENA LEAVES DURING SENESCENCE 8. THE ROLE OF L SERINE IN MODIFYING SENESCENCE 8. THE ROLE OF L SERINE IN MODIFYING SENESCENCE", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (1985), vol. 78, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 315 - 319, XP002490746 [A] 1,8,20,21 * the whole document * * abstract * * in particular: * * figure 6 * * table VI * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.78.2.315 | [A] - PILLAI BINDU RAMAN ET AL, "Enzymatic digestion: A safe and rapid technique for individual separation of Macrobrachium rosenbergii embryos for cryopreservation studies.", CRYOBIOLOGY, (200312), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0011-2240, pages 242 - 246, XP002490747 [A] 1,8,20,21 * the whole document * * in particular: * * abstract * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cryobiol.2003.09.004 | International search | [X]JPS60200167 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [X]JPH01118768 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD); | [X]JP2001204495 (ASAHI KASEI CORP); | [X]WO02061119 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al); | [X]JP2002315600 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) | by applicant | JPS60200167 | JPH01118768 | US5792736 | GB2348433 | WO0118165 | JP2001204495 | WO02061119 | JP2002315600 | EP1308787 | US2003175232 | - WISS. 0., Untersuchung uber Proteasen. Aminosauren, Blausaure und Pyrophosphat als Effektoren des Pepsins, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1946), vol. 29, pages 237 - 246 | - VEIERSKOV B. ET AL., METABOLISM OF OAT LEAVES DURING SENESCENCE, (1985), vol. 78, pages 315 - 319 | - PILLAI B.R.; MOHANTY J., "Enzymatic digestion - a safe and rapid technique for individual separation of Macrobrachium rosenbergii embryos for cryopreservation studies", CRYOBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 47, pages 242 - 246 | - IKUNOSUKE SAKURABAYASHI, CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 269 - 274 |