EP1797084 - NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC NF-kB INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4SC Discovery GmbH Am Klopferspitz 19a 82152 Planegg-Martinsried / DE | [2012/14] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states 4SC AG Am Klopferspitz 19a 82152 Martinsried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBAN, Johann Kopernikusweg 5 82152 Planegg / DE | 02 /
SCHMITT, Harald Fuststr. 8 55116 Mainz / DE | 03 /
WOLF, Kristina Johannishöhe 60 82288 Kottgeisering / DE | 04 /
PEGORARO, Stefano Röntgenstr. 35 82125 Planegg / DE | 05 /
WUZIK, Andreas Schlehenweg 9 86836 Untermeitingen / DE | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
LEBAN, Johann Kirchenstr. 25 82110 Germering / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMITT, Harald Fuststr. 8 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
WOLF, Kristina Margaretenplatz 4 81373 München / DE | |||
04 /
PEGORARO, Stefano Röntgenstr. 35 82125 Planegg / DE | |||
05 /
WUZIK, Andreas Hoher Ifen-Weg 7 86836 Untermeitingen / DE | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Kilger, Ute, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/42] | Kilger, Ute, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Helene-Lange-Strasse 3 14469 Potsdam / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05769860.7 | 29.07.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP08261 | Priority number, date | EP20040022363 | 20.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04022363 | US20040612794P | 27.09.2004 Original published format: US 612794 P | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032322 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797084 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D417/12, A61K31/4535, C07D495/04, C07D487/04, A61P25/28, A61P35/00, C07D277/56, C07D413/12, C07D417/04, C07D263/48, C07D211/62, C07D473/34, C07D513/04, A61K31/454 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
C07D263/48 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/12 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE HETEROCYCLISCHE NF-KB-INHIBITOREN | [2007/25] | English: | NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC NF-kB INHIBITORS | [2007/25] | French: | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES DU NF-kB | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/38] | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/38] | Divisional application(s) | EP10193705.0 / EP2343293 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2005003128 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-16 * Claims 1-15, 17; Formulae (I), (V2), (VI); examples; Table 1 *; | [X]EP1352650 (INST MED MOLECULAR DESIGN INC [JP]) [X] 1-22 * Claims 1-18; Compounds 180-223 *; | [A]WO2004014882 (AXYS PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9715567 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]) [X] 1-16 * Claims 1-9; Formula (I); examples 1(4), 1(5), 2(1), 2(2), 4(4), 6 *; | [X]WO2004058750 (METRIS THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,15-17,22 * Claims 1-38; Formulae (II), (III); compounds 8a-f; Table 5 *; | [X]WO2004058751 (METRIS THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,15,16 * Claims 1-33, 38-42; Formulae (II), (III); compounds 8a-e *; | [X]WO2004041815 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,15,16,19 * Claims 1-8, 11-13, 18-19; Formula (I); example 7 *; | [X]FR2270848 (CLIN MIDY [FR]) [X] 6,8,15,16,20 * Claims 1-13; Formulae (I) and (II); examples 13-44 *; | [X]FR1516777 (INNOTHERA LAB SA) [X] 6,8 * Claim 1; Formulae (I) and (V); examples 37-38 *; | [X]WO2004018453 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 6,7,9,12 * Formula (2); Preparations A-23, A-58, A-67, A-68, B-77, B-78 *; | [X]DE10208256 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 6-8,12,15,16,20 * Claims 1-13; Formula (I); Compound 5 *; | [PX]WO2005058887 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [PX] 6,7,15,16 * Claims 1-21; formula (I); examples * | [X] - BOGER D L ET AL, "A new class of highly cytotoxic diketopiperazines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (200005), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1019 - 1020, XP004204595 [X] 6,8 * Compounds 6 and 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00152-9 | [X] - LANGE U E W ET AL, "Synthesis of Highly potent and Selective Hetaryl Ureas as Integrin avb3-Receptor Antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (2002), vol. 12, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1379 - 1382, XP002289253 [X] 6,8,15,16,20 * Compounds 23a and 25a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(02)00161-0 | [X] - EL-SUBBAGH H ET AL, "2,4-Disubstituted thiazoles II. A novel class of antitumor agents, synthesis and biological evaluation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (1996), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 1017 - 1021, XP004071797 [X] 6,8,15,16,20 * Compounds 7 and 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(97)86181-8 | [X] - EKAMBARESWARA RAO K ET AL, "Synthesis of Novel Thiazole-Containing DNA Minor Groove Binding Oligopeptides Related to the Antibiotic Distamycin", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1990), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 728 - 737, XP002255609 [X] 6,8 * Compound 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00289a057 | [X] - R. KUMAR, J. WILLIAM LOWN, "Synthesis and Antitumot Cytotoxicity Evalutation of Novel Thiazole-Containing Glycosylated Polyamides", EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 24, pages 4842 - 4851, XP002346491 [X] 6,8,15,16,20 * Compounds 26-27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.200300532 | [X] - AI. KHALAF ET AL., "Distamycin Analogues with Enhanced Lipophilicity : Synthesis and Antimicrobial Activity", J. MED. CHEM., (20040305), vol. 47, no. 8, pages 2133 - 2156, XP002346492 [X] 6,8 * Compounds 28-29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm031089x | [X] - WIPF P ET AL, "Total Synthesis of (-)-Muscoride A", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1996), vol. 61, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6517 - 6522, XP002199739 [X] 6 * Compound 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo960891m | [X] - FRANCHETTI P ET AL, "A new C-nucleoside analogue of tiazofurin - synthesis and biological evaluation of 2-beta-d-ribofuranosylimidazole-4-carboxamide (imidazofurin)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (20010108), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 67 - 69, XP004225324 [X] 6 * Oxazofurin; Compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00594-1 | [X] - R.J. BOYCE, G. PATTENDEN, "Naturally Occuring 4-Methylthiazolines. A total Synthesis of (-)-[4R,4S']-Didehyrdomirabazole A", TETRAHEDRON, (1995), vol. 51, no. 26, pages 7313 - 7320, XP002346493 [X] 6 * Compounds 3, 9 and 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(95)00355-C | [X] - R.L. PARSONS JR., C.H. HEATHCOCK, "Total Synthesis of (-)-Thiangazole, a Naturally-Occuring HIV-1 Inhibitor", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 59, pages 4733 - 4734, XP002346494 [X] 6 * Compounds 1-2, 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00096a012 | [X] - P. WIPF, S. VENKATRAMAN, "Total Synthesis of (-)-Thiangazole and Structurally Related Polyazoles", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 60, pages 7224 - 7229, XP002346495 [X] 6 * Tantazoles A-B, F; Didehydrotantazole; compounds 11, 13-14, 16-17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00127a030 | [X] - C. HAHNEMANN, H. HARTMANN, "On the Reaction of Thiazole-2,4-diamines with Isothiocyanates - Preparation and Transformation of 2,4-Diaminothiazole-5-carbothioamides", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2003), vol. 86, pages 1949 - 1965, XP002346496 [X] 6,7 * Compounds 8a-b,d, 15f, 29e-g, 31a-e, 34a, 35a, 38a, 38d, 39a, 39d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200390154 | [X] - P.-Y. COQUERON ET AL., "Iterativer Aufbau von Oxazolringen über alpha-Chlorglycinate: Totalsynthese von (-)-Muscorid A", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (2003), vol. 115, no. 12, pages 1451 - 1454, XP002346497 [X] 6 * Compound 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.200390336 | [X] - P. WIPF, S. VENKATRAMAN, "From Aziridines to Oxazolines and Thiazolines: The Heterocyclic Route to Thiangazole", SYNLETT, (1997), vol. 1, pages 1 - 10, XP002346498 [X] 6 * Compounds 85, 87-88, 91, 94-95, 97, 99-100 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1997-681 | [X] - M. HERRMANN ET AL., "Chemical Modification of Thiangazole A in the Oxazole and Styryl Region", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 12, pages 3381 - 3392, XP002346499 [X] 6 * Compounds 1a-b, 2a-b, 5-11, 17, 21-22, 27-29, 32-33, 35, 36-47, 51-57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0690(199912)1999:12<3381::AID-EJOC3381>3.0.CO;2-W | [X] - J. DAS ET AL., "Thromboxane A2/Endoperoxide Receptor Antagonists: 1,3-DIoxane and 1,3-Dioxolane Analogs", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1993), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 1271 - 1276, XP002346707 [X] 6,8,9,12,15,16 * Compounds 1a-1f * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)80330-3 | Examination | WO2005118579 | WO2004067521 | WO03004020 | WO0220010 | EP0870765 | EP0934938 | US2002010316 | EP0994108 | WO0024724 | US5510478 | US4731446 | WO03099316 | - OGISHIMA M ET AL, "Z-338 facilitates acetylcholine release from enteric neurons due to blockade of muscarinic autoreceptors in guinea pig stomach", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (20000101), vol. 294, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 33 - 37, XP002962156 | - CRANK,G. AND FOULIS,M.J., "Derivatives of 2-Aminooxazoles Showing Antiinflammatory Activity", J. MED. CHEM., (1971), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1075 - 1077 | - L. FELIU ET AL., "Synthesis of Methyl 2-Acetylamino-5-(1,3-dithian-2-yl)thiazole-4- carboxylate", HETEROCYCLES, (1997), vol. 45, no. 7, pages 1299 - 1308, XP001525809 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3987/COM-97-7805 | - ROHTASH KUMAR ET AL, "Synthesis of Novel Thiazole-Containing BIS-1-Chloromethyl-5-Hydroxy-1,2-Dihydro-3H-Benz(e)Indole(seco-CBI)-Polyamide Conjugates as Anticancer Agents", HETEROCYCLIC COMMUNICATIONS, FREUND PUBLISHING HOUSE, TEL AVIV, (20020101), ISSN 0793-0283, pages 521 - 530, XP009145534 |