EP1778819 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MODIFYING BITUMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matthews, John Brodie 33 Sutton Road Omata New Plymouth 4310 / NZ | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2015/25] |
Former [2007/18] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05769879.7 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005NZ00176 | Priority number, date | NZ20040534302 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: NZ 53430204 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006009474 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778819 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778819 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10C3/04 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
C10C3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON BITUMEN | [2007/18] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MODIFYING BITUMEN | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER DU BITUME | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2005 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | LU | 20.07.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 20.07.2005 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | LT | 17.06.2015 | |
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 17.06.2015 | |
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]RU2000311 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 06, Database accession no. 1994-046632, XP008112104 & RU2000311 C1 19930907 (MOSCOW AUTO ROAD CONSTR INST) | Examination | RU2157824 | US3108060 | US4185025 | RU2000311 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 14, Database accession no. 2001-135420, & RU2157824 C2 20001020 ((KIRI-R) KIRISHINEFTEORGSINTEZ PRODN ASSOC) | by applicant | RU2000311 |