EP1781272 - USE OF COMPOUNDS ACTIVE ON THE SIGMA RECEPTOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF MECHANICAL ALLODYNIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEYENS CABRERA, José M. Departamento de Farmacologia Facultad de Medicina-Universidad de Granada Avda. de la Investigación, 11 18016 Granada / ES | [2017/26] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
BAEYENS CABRERA, José M., Universidad Grandada Avenida de Mardid, 12 E-18012 Granada / ES | Representative(s) | Peters, Hajo, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2010/38] | Peters, Hajo, et al Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05769972.0 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005EP08080 | Priority number, date | EP20040017561 | 24.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04017561 | EP20040017562 | 24.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04017562 | US20040902273 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 902273 | US20040902272 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 902272 | EP20040020376 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04020376 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010587 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781272 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781272 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61P29/00, A61P25/00, A61K31/7125 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/13 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/7125 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN MIT WIRKUNG AUF DEN SIGMA-REZEPTOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MECHANISCHER ALLODYNIE | [2007/19] | English: | USE OF COMPOUNDS ACTIVE ON THE SIGMA RECEPTOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF MECHANICAL ALLODYNIA | [2007/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES ACTIFS SUR LE RECEPTEUR SIGMA POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ALLODYNIE MECANIQUE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2005 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.07.2005 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6596756 (GOLDSTEIN DAVID JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 10, lines 19-57 *; | [X]EP1244498 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, lines 13-15 *; | [A]US2003171347 (MATSUMOTO RAE R [US]) [A] 14-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03078437 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim - * | [X] - SJOGREN, P. ET AL., "Disappearance of morphine-induced hyperalgesia after discontinuing or substituting morphine with other opioid agonists", PAIN, (1994), vol. 59, pages 313 - 316, XP002356374 [X] 1-13 * paragraph [CASEREPORT3]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(94)90084-1 | [X] - STEWART, L.S.A. & MARTIN, W.J., "Influence of positive analgesics on development of neuropathic pain in rats", COMPARATIVE MEDICINE, (200302), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 29 - 36, XP009057765 [X] 1-13 * paragraph [RESULTS]; figures 1-4 * | Examination | - GAGNON, B. ET AL., "Methadone in the treatment of neuropathic pain", PAIN RES MANAGE, (2003), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 149 - 154, XP009173229 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2003/236718 | - Laurent Monassier ET AL, "R Sigma receptors: from discovery to highlights of their implications in the cardiovascular system", (20020101), URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1046/j.1472-8206.2002.00063.x/abstract;jsessionid=D7ACF5CE06F742016C5E60EB9EB828B2.f02t04, (20150505), XP055187526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1472-8206.2002.00063.x |