EP1771775 - METHOD FOR DETECTING ERRORS IN SENSOR VALUES AND ERROR DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHMILLER, Winfried Fuggerstrasse 1 81373 München / DE | 02 /
ZECHA, Christian Waxensteinstrasse 4c 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | [2007/15] | Application number, filing date | 05770007.2 | 26.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005DE01314 | Priority number, date | DE20041037352 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004037352 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006012854 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771775 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771775 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP,US);
G05B23/0275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/45] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG VON SENSORWERTEN UND FEHLERERKENNUNGS-EINRICHTUNG | [2007/15] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING ERRORS IN SENSOR VALUES AND ERROR DETECTION DEVICE | [2007/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ERREUR SUR DES VALEURS DE CAPTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'ERREUR | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5680409 (QIN S JOE [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 50 - column 12, line 30 *; | [A]WO0148571 (ASPEN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) |