EP1750622 - UNSTENTED HEART VALVE WITH FORMED IN PLACE SUPPORT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Direct Flow Medical, Inc. 451 Aviation Boulevard, Suite 107A Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2013/09] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Direct Flow Medical, Inc. 1725 Copperhill Parkway Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASHINSKI, Randall, T. 675 Pleasant Avenue Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | 02 /
BISHOP, Gordon, B. 2487 Murdock Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95404 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2007/07] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9, P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 05770163.3 | 05.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US15617 | Priority number, date | US20040568402P | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 568402 P | US20040572561P | 19.05.2004 Original published format: US 572561 P | US20040581664P | 21.06.2004 Original published format: US 581664 P | US20040586002P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586002 P | US20040586006P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586006 P | US20040586110P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586110 P | US20040586005P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586005 P | US20040586054P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586054 P | US20040586055P | 07.07.2004 Original published format: US 586055 P | US20040588106P | 15.07.2004 Original published format: US 588106 P | US20040603324P | 20.08.2004 Original published format: US 603324 P | US20040605204P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605204 P | US20040610269P | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 610269 P | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005107650 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750622 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750622 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61F2/014 (EP,US);
A61F2/2409 (EP,US);
A61F2/2415 (EP,US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2/2439 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0682 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0406 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06019 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0647 (EP,US);
A61F2002/061 (EP,US);
A61F2002/068 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30583 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30672 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0085 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0066 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0078 (EP,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | STENTLOSE HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE MIT IN SITU FORMBARER STÜTZSTRUKTUR | [2007/07] | English: | UNSTENTED HEART VALVE WITH FORMED IN PLACE SUPPORT STRUCTURE | [2007/07] | French: | VALVULE CARDIAQUE SANS ENDOPROTHESE ET POURVUE D'UNE STRUCTURE SUPPORT FORMEE IN SITU | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 12.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11179539.9 / EP2425801 | EP11179543.1 / EP2422751 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2005 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | LU | 05.05.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4183102 (GUISET JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1-8,19,21-27* figures 6,9 *; | [A]US4592340 (BOYLES PAUL W [US]) [A] 1-8,19,21-27 * figure 2 *; | [XDY]US5554185 (BLOCK PETER C [US], et al) [XD] 19 * column 1, line 56 - line 61 * * column 3, line 47 - line 52 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 1 * * figures 1,1a,4a-4c * [Y] 1-8,21-27; | [A]US6007575 (SAMUELS SHAUN LAURENCE WILKIE [US]) [A] 1-8,19,21-27 * figure 7 * * column 2, line 28 - line 29 * * column 5, line 17 - line 28 *; | [Y]WO0041652 (LETAC BRICE [FR]) [Y] 1-8,21-27 * page 7, line 29 - line 33 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2003023303 (PALMAZ JULIO C [US], et al) [A] 1-8,19,21-27 * figures 13,14 * | by applicant | US20000496231 | US20000586937 |