EP1889181 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PROCESS A DATA SEARCH REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Ebay, Inc. 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POSNER, Nicolas David 15 Calypso Lane San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
IDURY, Ramana M. 1048 Polk Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, Richard Douglas 942 Michigan Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 04 /
SHOUP, Randall Scott 533 Liberty Street San Francisco, California 94114 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Vijay 900 Pepper Tree Lane no. 118 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 06 /
MONIER, Louis Marcel Gino 4 Siskiyou Place Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 07 /
BAIRD-SMITH, Anselm Paul 3448 Madonna Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | 08 /
NELSON, Thomas 161 Old Ranch Road Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | 09 /
GUPTA, Raghav 1172 Corral Ave. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 10 /
TUTUNDJIAN, Raffi 1665 Chestnut Street no. 303 San Frasncisco, California 94123 / US | 11 /
SMALLEY, Preston Grant 134 Gil Blas Road Danville, California 94526 / US | 12 /
BOLIVAR Alvaro 111 Saragota Ave, Apt 2310 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2010/04] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
POSNER, Nicolas David 15 Calypso Lane San Carlos, California 94070 / US | ||
02 /
IDURY, Ramana M. 1048 Polk Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
03 /
HENDERSON, Richard Douglas 942 Michigan Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | |||
04 /
SHOUP, Randall Scott 533 Liberty Street San Francisco, California 94114 / US | |||
05 /
KUMAR, Vijay 900 Pepper Tree Lane no. 118 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
06 /
MONIER, Louis Marcel Gino 4 Siskiyou Place Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | |||
07 /
BAIRD-SMITH, Anselm Paul 3448 Madonna Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | |||
08 /
NELSON, Thomas 161 Old Ranch Road Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | |||
09 /
GUPTA, Raghav 1172 Corral Ave. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
10 /
TUTUNDJIAN, Raffi 1665 Chestnut Street no. 303 San Frasncisco, California 94123 / US | |||
11 /
SMALLEY, Preston Grant 134 Gil Blas Road Danville, California 94526 / US | |||
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
POSNER, Nicolas David 15 Calypso Lane San Carlos, California 94070 / US | ||
02 /
IDURY, Ramana M. 1048 Polk Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
03 /
HENDERSON, Richard Douglas 942 Michigan Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | |||
04 /
SHOUP, Randall Scott 533 Liberty Street San Francisco, California 94114 / US | |||
05 /
KUMAR, Vijay 900 Pepper Tree Lane no. 118 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
06 /
MONIER, Louis Marcel Gino 4 Siskiyou Place Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | |||
07 /
BAIRD-SMITH, Anselm Paul 3448 Madonna Drive San Jose, California 95117 / US | |||
08 /
NELSON, Thomas 161 Old Ranch Road Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | |||
09 /
GUPTA, Raghav 1272 Corral Ave. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
10 /
TUTUNDJIAN, Raffi 1665 Chestnut Street no. 303 San Frasncisco, California 94123 / US | |||
11 /
SMALLEY, Preston Grant 134 Gil Blas Road Danville, California 94526 / US | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05770183.1 | 16.05.2005 | [2008/08] | WO2005US17024 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006124027 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889181 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/90328 (EP,US);
G06F16/90335 (US);
G06F16/3322 (EP,US);
G06F16/3338 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER DATENSUCHANFORDERUNG | [2008/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PROCESS A DATA SEARCH REQUEST | [2008/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DEMANDE DE RECHERCHE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/19] | 28.12.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6363377 (KRAVETS DINA [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 57 * * column 9, line 16 - column 13, line 36 * * figures 4,5,8,11 *; | [X]US2002184206 (EVANS DAVID A [US]) [X] 1,11,23,24,30 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US2003014405 (SHAPIRO JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 5-7b * * claims 5-10 *; | [X]US2003212666 (BASU SANKAR [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,11,23-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0056] *; | [X] - MARTI HEARST, "Chapter 10: User Interfaces and Visualization", MODERN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, New York, (1999), pages 257 - 323, URL: http://people.ischool.berkeley.edu/~hearst/irbook/print/chap10.pdf, (20091015), XP002550611 [X] 1-30 * page 278 - page 288 * | [XA] - ZUKERMAN I ET AL, "Query expansion and query reduction in document retrieval", PROCEEDINGS 15TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOOLS WITH ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE. ICTAI 2003. SACRAMENTO, CA, NOV. 3 - 5, 2003; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOOLS WITH ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE], LOS ALAMITOS, CA, IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20031103), vol. CONF. 15, ISBN 978-0-7695-2038-4, pages 552 - 559, XP010672276 [X] 24-30 * the whole document * [A] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAI.2003.1250240 | International search | [Y]US6516312 (KRAFT REINER [US], et al); | [Y]US2004199491 (BHATT NIKHIL [US]); | [Y]US2005027705 (SADRI PASHA [US], et al) | Examination | - VOORHEES E M ED - CROFT W B ET AL, "QUERY EXPANSION USING LEXICAL-SEMANTIC RELATIONS", SIGIR '94. DUBLIN, JULY 3 - 6, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM-SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL], BERLIN, SPRINGER, DE, (19940703), vol. CONF. 17, pages 61 - 69, XP000475315 | by applicant | US6363377 | US2002184206 | US2003014405 | US2003212666 |