EP1913876 - TREATMENT DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Keita 1-35-13-1403, Fujimi-cho Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0013 / JP | 02 /
BAN, Atsushi 2974-24-504, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0032 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05770426.4 | 11.08.2005 | [2008/17] | WO2005JP14768 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017949 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913876 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, A61B1/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A61B10/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (KR);
A61M31/00 (KR);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B17/3478 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2008/36] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ENDOSKOP | [2008/17] | English: | TREATMENT DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPE | [2008/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT POUR ENDOSCOPE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2008 | Translation filed | 14.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 12.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4919152 (GER RALPH [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 55 - line 65 * * column 3, line 33 - line 45; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5456684 (SCHMIDT MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-4* column 3, line 40 - line 59; figure 3 * | International search | [X]JP2002505904 ; | [XP]JP2005224426 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2001327512 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0551314U |