EP1777710 - CUSHIONING BODY OF CASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku 108-8215 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAKI, Hiroki c/o Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe, Hyogo-ken 652-8585 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Yuichi c/o Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe, Hyogo-ken 652-8585 / JP | 03 /
HOJO, Kiminobu c/o Takasago Res. & Develop. Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Tadashi c/o Takasago Res. & Develop. Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroshi c/o Takasago Res. & Develop. Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | 06 /
KITADA, Akio c/o Takasago Res. & Develop. Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
TAMAKI, Hiroki, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe, Hyogo-ken 652-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Yuichi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe Hyogo-ken 652-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
HOJO, Kiminobu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
KIMURA, Tadashi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1 , Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroshi, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | |||
06 /
KITADA, Akio, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-chi Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/10] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05770445.4 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005JP14657 | Priority number, date | JP20040233695 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004233695 | [2007/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016606 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777710 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777710 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/32, G21F9/36, G21F5/08 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G21F5/08 (EP,US);
G21C19/32 (KR);
G21F5/06 (KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KISSEN-KÖRPER EINES FASSES | [2007/17] | English: | CUSHIONING BODY OF CASK | [2007/17] | French: | CORPS AMORTISSEUR DE CASQUE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | Translation filed | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2005 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | GB | 10.08.2017 | IE | 10.08.2017 | LU | 10.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.08.2005 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.08.2005 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4620106 (OLIVIERI ANTONIO [IT], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US6234311 (FRANCOIS DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 1, line 19 - line 24; figure -; claim - *; | [XA]JP2003315493 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * [A] 8-18 | International search | [Y]JPS6140368U ; | [Y]JPS6140369U ; | [Y]JPH10230973 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2000162386 (TRANSNUCLEAIRE SA); | [Y]JP2001083291 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2002211649 (HONDA EXPRESS CO LTD, et al); | [X]JP2003315493 (HITACHI LTD) |