EP1789340 - CONNECTING PIECE FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Menshen GmbH + Co. KG Industriestrasse 26 57413 Finnentrop / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Georg Menshen GmbH + Co. KG Industriestrasse 26 D-57413 Finnentrop / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜMMLER, Christoph Goethestrasse 29 58840 Plettenberg / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05771229.1 | 09.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005EP08616 | Priority number, date | DE20041042717 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004042717 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027072 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1789340 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D49/12 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
B65D75/5872 (EP);
B65D49/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUTZEN FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2007/22] | English: | CONNECTING PIECE FOR A CONTAINER | [2007/22] | French: | TUBULURE POUR RECIPIENT | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9710155 (ERLICH, EGON) [X] 1,2,6,9 * page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 12; figure 1; claims 1,11 *; | [X]CH678714 (MIFA AG FRENKENDORF) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 11; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US1704648 (BOUFFARTIQUE JOSE G) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 59; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2517064 (WALES NATHANIEL B) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 51 - line 62; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]GB1087370 (BOXAL FRIBOURG, S.A) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 54 - page 2, line 6; figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]FR810196 (PATENT TUBE CORP) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 84 - page 3, line 50 * * page 5, line 74 - line 84; figures 8,9; claims 1,2 * |