EP1782079 - CALIBRATION STANDARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenberger Hochfrequenztechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 83413 Fridolfing / DE | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Frank Alter Wiednitzerweg 8 02994 Bernsdorf / DE | 02 /
OPPELT, Reiner Salzburgerstr. 32 83404 Ainring / DE | 03 /
NESTLER, Gerhard Öttingerstr. 42 84329 Wurmannsquick / DE | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Kandlbinder, Markus Christian Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Kandlbinder, Markus Christian Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05771469.3 | 26.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005EP08112 | Priority number, date | DE2004213305U | 25.08.2004 Original published format: DE 20413305 U | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006021280 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782079 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782079 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R35/00, H01R13/646 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H01R24/46 (EP,US);
G01R27/32 (EP,US);
G01R35/005 (EP,US);
G01R1/0408 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | G01R5/00, H01R13/646 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERSTANDARD | [2007/19] | English: | CALIBRATION STANDARD | [2007/19] | French: | TALON DE CALIBRAGE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 29.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | IE | 10.12.2008 | LT | 10.12.2008 | LV | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | IS | 10.04.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | AT | 26.07.2009 | LU | 26.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
AT | 26.07.2009 | ||
LU | 26.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
AT | 26.07.2009 | ||
LU | 26.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
AT | 26.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | LT | 10.12.2008 | |
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3254316 (MCHENRY VINCENT J) [A] 1* column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0323153 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 2 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 24 *; | [A]US5091709 (POLLARD ROGER D [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1182744 (SPINNER GMBH ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [DA]DE10211334 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] *; | [A]US2004002232 (JOHNSON MORGAN T [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0051] * |