EP1784914 - AUXILIARY TRANSISTOR GATE BIAS CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies, Inc. 1801 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEITSCHEGGER, William, Kerr 103 Moreland Court Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Modin, Jan Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Modin, Jan Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05771552.6 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005US24180 | Priority number, date | US20040589709P | 21.07.2004 Original published format: US 589709 P | US20050151793 | 14.06.2005 Original published format: US 151793 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006019606 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784914 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/10, // H03F1/02 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
H03G3/3036 (EP,US);
H03F1/0288 (EP,US);
H03F1/30 (EP,US);
H03F3/602 (EP,US);
H03F2200/198 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | H03G3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HILFSTRANSISTOR-GATE-VORSPANNUNGSSTEUERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2007/20] | English: | AUXILIARY TRANSISTOR GATE BIAS CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2007/20] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE POLARISATION DE GACHETTE DE TRANSISTOR AUXILIAIRE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5532646 (AIHARA YUKICHI [JP]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 33; figures 3,7 *; | [A]WO9800912 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-20* page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 6; figure 1 *; | [X]US5757237 (STAUDINGER JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 38; figure 2 *; | [A] - YANG Y ET AL, "A MICROWAVE DOHERTY AMPLIFIER EMPLOYING ENVELOPE TRACKING TECHNIQUE FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY AND LINEARITY", IEEE MICROWAVE AND WIRELESS COMPONENTS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200309), vol. 13, no. 9, ISSN 1531-1309, pages 370 - 372, XP001172269 [A] 1-20 *Sections: I. Introduction II. Implementation of the Proposed Doherty Amplifier Figures 1,2* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LMWC.2003.817130 | International search | [X]US6710649 (MATSUMOTO HIDETOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6529072 (TAKADA TOSHIO [JP]); | [Y]US6388546 (KIYOKAWA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) |