EP1794391 - LOCKING MECHANISM FOR USE WITH STAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michell, Andrew 16 Melville Road London SW13 9RJ / GB | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman Molony 20 Staple Gardens Winchester SO23 8SR / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman Molony Renshaw Barns Upper Woodford Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 6FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05771800.9 | 17.08.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005GB03227 | Priority number, date | GB20040020073 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0420073 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027546 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794391 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/28 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
E04H3/28 (EP,US);
E04B2002/7474 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT BÜHNENSYSTEM | [2007/24] | English: | LOCKING MECHANISM FOR USE WITH STAGING SYSTEM | [2007/24] | French: | MECANISME DE VERROUILLAGE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS UN SYSTEME DE SEPARATION D'ETAGES | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0188311 (LARNER PAUL RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004020154 (GRESCHBACH HUBERTUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3964402 (JENNE JAMES F, et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0188311 |