EP1786740 - NANOSTRUCTURED COATINGS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitro, S.A.B. de C.V. Av. Ricardo Margain Zozaya No. 400 Col. Valle del Campestre San Pedro Garza Garcia Nuevo León, México 66265 / MX | [2017/09] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Songwei 406 Stag Horn Drive Wexford, P 15090 / US | 02 /
BOYKIN, Cheri, M. 513 Cloverdale Court Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Caroline, S. 921 Farragut Street Pittsburgh, PA 15206 / US | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 05772397.5 | 18.07.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005US25381 | Priority number, date | US20040897847 | 22.07.2004 Original published format: US 897847 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006020188 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786740 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786740 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/34, C03C17/245, C03C17/25 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/006 (EP,US);
C03C23/00 (EP,US);
C03C23/0005 (EP,US);
C23C10/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/34 (EP,US);
C23C16/402 (EP,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
C23C16/407 (EP,US);
C23C18/00 (EP,US);
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B05D1/06 (EP,US);
B05D2203/35 (EP,US);
B05D2601/24 (EP,US);
C03C2217/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/40] |
Former [2007/44] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NANOSTRUKTURIERTE BESCHICHTUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2007/21] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURED COATINGS AND RELATED METHODS | [2007/21] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS À NANOSTRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6465088 (TALPAERT XAVIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,8-14,19,22-24,28,29,32 * figure -; example - *; | [X]US2002150681 (BOIRE PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-14,19-24,28,32 * The whole document, but in particular paragraphs 0032, 0039, 0041 and 0065, examples 2, 3 and 5 *; | [X]US2003235695 (GREENBERG CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-14,19-24,28-30,32 * whole document, but in particular, examples and tables and claim 17 *; | [X]US2004043260 (NADAUD NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,19-21,28-32 * whole document, but in particular paragraph 0024 and the examples *; | [X]WO2004035496 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9-14,19-24,28,29,32 * whole document, especially the examples "Article 2" and "Article 15", Table 8, the claims, p. 3, l. 21-25 and p.9, l. 14-20 *; | [X] - CEMBRERO J ET AL, "Nanocolumnar ZnO films for photovoltaic applications", PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, NL, (20040322), vol. 451-452, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 198 - 202, XP004495093 [X] 28-30,32 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tsf.2003.10.119 |