EP1776587 - USE OF C3A AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS BIOMARKER FOR COLORECTAL ADENOMA AND/OR CARCINOMA ; DIAGNOSIS METHODS AND ASSAYS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/17] | USE OF C3A AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS A BIOMARKER FOR COLORECTAL ADENOMA AND/OR CARCINOMA; DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND TEST SYSTEM USING THE SAME | ||
[2008/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indivumed GmbH Orchideenstieg 14 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUHL, Hartmut Nienstedtener Strasse 18 22609 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
DAVID, Kerstin Chateauneufstrasse 10 20535 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
FENTZ, Anne-Kristin Heymannstrasse 10a 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
JUHL, Hartmut Kurt-Küchler-Strasse 5 22609 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
DAVID, Kerstin Chateauneufstrasse 10 20535 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
FENTZ, Anne-Kristin Heymannstrasse 10a 20253 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05772471.8 | 11.08.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP08742 | Priority number, date | WO2004EP09124 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: PCT/EP2004/009124 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006053592 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776587 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776587 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1776587 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/57419 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57488 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/78 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2333/76 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON C3A UND DERIVATEN ALS BIOMARKER FÜR KOLOREKTALADENOM UND/ODER -KARZINOM ; NACHWEISVERFAHREN UND TESTSYSTEM DAMIT | [2008/16] | English: | USE OF C3A AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS BIOMARKER FOR COLORECTAL ADENOMA AND/OR CARCINOMA ; DIAGNOSIS METHODS AND ASSAYS USING THE SAME | [2008/16] | French: | UTILISATION DE C3A ET DÉRIVÉS COMME BIOMARQUEURS D'ADENOME COLORECTAL ET/OU DE CARCINOME COLORECTAL ; PROCÉDÉS ET TESTS DIAGNOSTIQUES LES UTILISANT | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | VERWENDUNG VON C3A UND DERIVATEN DAVON ALS BIOMARKER FÜR KOLOREKTALES ADENOM UND/ODER KARZINOM, DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND TESTSYSTEM DAMIT | ||
Former [2007/17] | USE OF C3A AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS A BIOMARKER FOR COLORECTAL ADENOMA AND/OR CARCINOMA; DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND TEST SYSTEM USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2007/17] | UTILISATION DE LA C3A ET DE DÉRIVÉS DE CELLE-CI COMME BIOMARQUEUR POUR UN ADENOME COLORECTAL ET/OU UN CARCINOME COLORECTAL ; PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC ET SYSTÈME DE TEST UTILISANT CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | IS | 30.04.2009 | LU | 11.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 11.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2001023066 (KINDERS ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0015] - [0018] , [0020] - [0022] - [0046] , [0047] , [0065] , [0067] , [0095] - [0120] - [0147] - [0173] * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6682740 (ERDEI ANNA [HU], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2005008251 (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 18,21 * page 48, line 1 - page 57, line 29 * * claim 27 * * page 10, line 29 - line 32 * * tables 1,2 * * claims 1-35 * [Y] 1-6,8-16,19,22,24,25; | [XY] - SWAHN M. ET AL., "Complement activation in ovarian cancer.", EUR. J. CANCER, (200104), vol. 37, page S320, XP004478426 [X] 18 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,8-16,19,22,24,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(01)81677-4 | [XA] - BURGER R. ET AL., "The C terminus of the anaphylatoxin C3a generated upon complement activation represents a neoantigenic determinant with diagnostic potential.", J. IMMUNOL., (19880715), vol. 141, no. 2, pages 553 - 558, XP002363694 [X] 18 * page 554, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 554, column 2, paragraph 3 * * the whole document * [A] 1-17,19-26 | [XA] - ZILOW G. ET AL., "Quantitation of the anaphylatoxin C3a in the presence of C3 by a novel sandwich ELISA using monoclonal antibody to a C3a neoepitope.", J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1989), vol. 121, pages 261 - 268, XP002314357 [X] 18 * abstract * * page 262, column 1, line 24 - line 39 * * the whole document * [A] 1-17,19-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(89)90169-5 | [A] - ANDOH A. ET AL., "Detection of complement C3 and factor B gene expression in normal colorectal mucosa, adenomas and carcinomas.", CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 111, pages 477 - 483, XP002363695 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.1998.00496.x | [A] - SARBINOWSKI R. ET AL., "Plasma concentration of procalcitonin and systemic inflammatory response syndrome after colorectal surgery.", ACTA ANAESTHESIOL. SCAND., (200502), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 191 - 196, XP002363696 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-6576.2004.00565.x |