EP1787829 - TIRE WHEEL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTAKA, Takeshi, c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD HIRATSUKA FACTORY, 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Makio, c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD HIRATSUKA FACTORY, 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05772549.1 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP14963 | Priority number, date | JP20040248304 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004248304 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022167 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787829 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/06, C08L9/00, C08K5/098, C08L61/06 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
B60C17/04 (EP,US);
B60C17/043 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/0091 (EP,US);
C08L61/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/16 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/49] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADANORDNUNG MIT REIFEN | [2007/21] | English: | TIRE WHEEL ASSEMBLY | [2007/21] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE PNEU/ROUE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2007 | Translation filed | 27.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JP2003292673 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004106692 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JP2004181640 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JP2004181989 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) |